EP1148959 - DEVICE FOR CONTINUOS HORIZONTAL CASTING, ESPECIALLY OF STRIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.12.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Revocation of patent | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thöni Industriebetriebe Gesellschaft m.b.H. Obermarktstrasse 48 6410 Telfs / AT | [2001/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEDER, Roland Alseggerstrasse 19 A-1180 Wien / AT | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 00902476.1 | 28.01.2000 | [2001/44] | WO2000AT00022 | Priority number, date | AT19990000114 | 28.01.1999 Original published format: AT 11499 | [2001/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0044515 | Date: | 03.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1148959 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1148959 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/045 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
B22D11/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2002/48] |
Former [2001/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM HORIZONTALEN STRANGGIESSEN, INSBESONDERE VON BÄNDERN | [2001/44] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTINUOS HORIZONTAL CASTING, ESPECIALLY OF STRIPS | [2001/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA COULEE EN CONTINU HORIZONTALE, EN PARTICULIER LA COULEE DE FEUILLARDS | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 09.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.08.2003
ADMISSIBLE SMS Meer GmbH Demag Technica Daimlerstrasse 4 97209 Veitshöchheim / DE Opponent's representative Valentin, Ekkehard, et al, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.08.2003
ADMISSIBLE SMS Meer GmbH Demag Technica Daimlerstrasse 4 97209 Veitshöchheim / DE Opponent's representative Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | 21.10.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.05.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.08.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2008 | 22.08.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.09.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/03] | 07.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.11.2002 | GB | 27.11.2002 | IT | 27.11.2002 | AT | 28.01.2003 | CH | 31.01.2007 | LI | 31.01.2007 | DE | 01.08.2007 | [2007/48] |
Former [2007/35] | FR | 27.11.2002 | |
GB | 27.11.2002 | ||
IT | 27.11.2002 | ||
AT | 28.01.2003 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FR | 27.11.2002 | |
GB | 27.11.2002 | ||
AT | 28.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | GB | 27.11.2002 | |
AT | 28.01.2003 | ||
FR | 05.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 27.11.2002 | |
FR | 05.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FR | 05.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4252178 (HUDD ANTHONY W) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [X]EP0083916 (VER EDELSTAHLWERKE AG [AT]) [X] 1-4 * figures 3-10; claims 1-6 *; | [X]US4541478 (SCHUBERT HERMANN [AT], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0268143 (CONCAST STANDARD AG [CH]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]EP0279106 (STEEL CASTING ENG LTD [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 5; figures 1-4 * * column 9, line 8 - column 11, line 33 *; | [X]US4789021 (AHRENS MAX [US]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-4; claims 1-8 *; | [X]EP0470608 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 6, line 34 - line 50; figure 5 * |