EP1152059 - NOVEL CYTOKINE RECFPTOR-LIKE PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kitamura, Toshio 6-16-20-406, Shirokane Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Kitamura, Toshio 6-16-20-406, Shirokane Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAMURA, Toshio 6-16-20-406, Shirokane Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0072 / JP | 02 /
FUJIO, Keishi 2-16-42-501, Takanawa Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0074 / JP | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/45] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00904039.5 | 18.02.2000 | [2001/45] | WO2000JP00939 | Priority number, date | JP19990041936 | 19.02.1999 Original published format: JP 4193699 | [2001/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0049148 | Date: | 24.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152059 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C12N1/15, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12P21/02, C07K14/715, C07K16/28, G01N33/53, G01N33/15, G01N33/50 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
C07K14/715 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CYTOKIN-REZEPTOREN-AHNLICHE PROTEINE | [2001/47] | English: | NOVEL CYTOKINE RECFPTOR-LIKE PROTEIN | [2001/45] | French: | NOUVELLE PROTEINE DE TYPE RECEPTEUR DE CYTOKINES | [2001/45] |
Former [2001/45] | Cytokin-Rezeptoren-ähnliche Proteine | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2001 | Translation filed | 28.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 06.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T] - HIROYAMA TAKASHI ET AL, "Molecular cloning and characterization of CRLM-2, a novel type I cytokine receptor preferentially expressed in hematopoietic cells", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20000527), vol. 272, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 224 - 229, XP002194487 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2000.2764 | [ ] - "CRLF2_MOUSE", UniProt, (20040329), Database accession no. Q8CII9, URL: EMBL, XP002323114 [ ] * the whole document * | [T] - FUJIO K ET AL, "MOLECULAR CLONING OF A NOVEL TYPE 1 CYTOKINE RECEPTOR SIMILAR TO THE COMMON GAMMA CHAIN", BLOOD, W.B. SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, VA, US, (20000401), vol. 95, no. 7, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2204 - 2211, XP000946169 | [T] - PARK LINDA S ET AL, "Cloning of the murine thymic stromal lymphopoietin (TSLP) receptor: Formation of a functional heteromeric complex requires interleukin 7 receptor", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, TOKYO, JP, (20000904), vol. 192, no. 5, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 659 - 669, XP002193895 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.192.5.659 | [T] - PANDEY A ET AL, "CLONING OF A RECEPTOR SUBUNIT REQUIRED FOR SIGNALING BY THYMIC STROMAL LYMPHOPOIETIN", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP,, GB, (200007), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1529-2908, pages 59 - 64, XP008014551 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/76923 | [A] - LIU K D ET AL, "JAK/STAT signaling by cytokine receptors", CURRENT OPINION IN IMMUNOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY LTD, XX, (199806), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 0952-7915, pages 271 - 278, XP004327205 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0952-7915(98)80165-9 | [A] - BAZAN J F, "STRUCTURAL DESIGN AND MOLECULAR EVOLUTION OF A CYTOKINE RECEPTOR SUPERFAMILY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199009), vol. 87, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6934 - 6938, XP000864534 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.87.18.6934 | [A] - BAGLEY C J ET AL, "THE STRUCTURAL AND FUNCTIONAL BASIS OF CYTOKINE RECEPTOR ACTIVATION: LESSONS FROM THE COMM BETA SUBUNIT OF THE GRANULOCYTE-MACROPHAGE COLONY-STIMULATING FACTOR, INTERLEUKINS-3 (IL-3), AND IL-5 RECEPTORS", BLOOD, W.B. SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, VA, US, (19970301), vol. 89, no. 5, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1471 - 1482, XP001052641 | [A] - "mh45d07.r1 Soares mouse placenta 4NbMP13.5 14.5 Mus musculus cDNA clone IMAGE:445453 5', mRNA sequence", GENBANK, (19970121), Database accession no. AA018020, URL: EMBL, XP002323107 [A] * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5378808 ; | [AP]WO9947538 | [A] - SATORU KUMAKI ET. AL., "Cloning of the mouse inteleukin 2 receptor gamma chain: demonstration of functional differences between the mouse and human receptors.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATION, (19930528), vol. 193, no. 1, pages 356 - 363, XP002828874 | [A] - KAREN EHRENMAN ET. AL., "The erythropoietin receptor gene: Cloning and identification of multiple transcripts in an Erythroid Cell Line OCIMI.", EXPERIMENTAL HEMATOLOGY, (199110), vol. 19, no. 9, pages 973 - 977, XP002928875 | [A] - CONSTANCE TOM NOGUCHI ET. AL., "Cloning of the human erythropoietin receptor gene.", BLOOD, (19911115), vol. 78, no. 10, pages 2548 - 2556, XP002928876 |