EP1144435 - PYROGLUTAMIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND RELATED COMPOUNDS WHICH INHIBIT LEUKOCYTE ADHESION MEDIATED BY VLA-4 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | |||
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | |||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRESSEN, Darren, B. 3110 Casa De Campo, 2 San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 02 /
KREFT, Anthony 43 Barley Court Langhorne, PA 19047 / US | 03 /
KUBRAK, Dennis 3231 Gaul Street Philidelphia, PA 19128 / US | 04 /
MANN, Charles, William 122 South Fifth Street North Wales, PA 19454 / US | 05 /
PLEISS, Michael, A. 848 Stella Court Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 06 /
STACK, Gary, Paul 525 Brookfield Lane Ambler, PA 19002 / US | 07 /
THORSETT, Eugene, D. 571 Buena Vista Moss Beach, CA 94038 / US | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Roques, Sarah Elizabeth, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Roques, Sarah Elizabeth, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/42] | Senior, Janet, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00904486.8 | 21.01.2000 | [2001/42] | WO2000US01537 | Priority number, date | US19990238661 | 26.01.1999 Original published format: US 238661 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0043413 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1144435 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1144435 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
C07K5/06173 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Extension states | AL | 26.07.2001 | LT | 26.07.2001 | LV | 26.07.2001 | MK | 26.07.2001 | RO | 26.07.2001 | SI | 26.07.2001 | Title | German: | PYROGLUTAMINSÄUREDERIVATE UND DAMIT VERWANDTE VERBINDUNGEN, DIE DIE DURCH VLA-4 VERMITTELTE LEUKOZYTENADHÄSION VERRINGERN | [2001/42] | English: | PYROGLUTAMIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND RELATED COMPOUNDS WHICH INHIBIT LEUKOCYTE ADHESION MEDIATED BY VLA-4 | [2001/42] | French: | DERIVES D'ACIDE PYROGLUTAMIQUE ET COMPOSES ASSOCIES, INHIBITEURS DE L'ADHESION LEUKOCYTAIRE A MEDIATION DE VLA-4 | [2001/42] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2001/42: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar. | EPB 2001/42: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available. | EPB 2001/42: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles. | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 13.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 07.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05019666.6 / EP1612215 | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12] | Request for further processing for: | 07.11.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.11.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.04.2006 | BE | 12.04.2006 | CH | 12.04.2006 | CY | 12.04.2006 | FI | 12.04.2006 | LI | 12.04.2006 | NL | 12.04.2006 | DK | 12.07.2006 | SE | 12.07.2006 | GR | 13.07.2006 | PT | 12.09.2006 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IT | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 12.04.2006 | |
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 12.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9601644 (ATHENA NEUROSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [A] 1,16,28-30 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9748726 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,12 * page 30, line 35 *; | [PA]WO9906432 (ATHENA NEUROSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [PA] 1,16,28-30 * example -; claim - *; | [PX]WO9967230 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-30 * example -; claim - *; | [X] - PAPAIOANNOU, DIONISSIOS ET AL, "Facile preparation of the 1-hydroxybenzotriazolyl ester of N-tritylpyroglutamic acid and its application to the synthesis of TRH, [D-His2]TRH and analogs incorporating cis- and trans-4-hydroxy-L-proline", ACTA CHEM. SCAND. (1995), 49(2), 103-14, (199502), XP002141997 [X] 1-9,12 * compound 15a;; figure 1 * | [X] - KATO, YOJI ET AL, "Oxidative degradation of collagen and its model peptide by ultraviolet irradiation", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM. (1992), 40(3), 373-9, (1992), XP002141998 [X] 1-9,12 * figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00015a003 | [X] - EWENSON, A. ET AL, "Analogs of substance P containing an.alpha.-hydroxy,.beta.-amino acid: synthesis and biological activity", EUR. J. MED. CHEM. (1991), 26(4), 435-42, (1991), XP002141999 [X] 1-9,12 * scheme 3; page 441, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0223-5234(91)90104-U |