EP1148855 - RUBBER HOT-WATER BOTTLE CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lange, Georg Oswald Heidelberger Strasse 21 28203 Bremen / DE | [2001/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | von Ahsen, Erwin-Detlef, et al Von Ahsen, Nachtwey & Kollegen Anwaltskanzlei Wilhelm-Herbst-Strasse 5 28359 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | von Ahsen, Erwin-Detlef, et al Anwaltsbüro von Ahsen, Postfach 107740 28077 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00904874.5 | 05.01.2000 | [2001/44] | WO2000EP00033 | Priority number, date | DE1999100197 | 06.01.1999 Original published format: DE 19900197 | [2001/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0040187 | Date: | 13.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1148855 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/02 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
A61F7/086 (EP,US);
Y10S383/901 (EP,US);
Y10S383/904 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GUMMIWÄRMFLASCHENVERSCHLUSS | [2001/44] | English: | RUBBER HOT-WATER BOTTLE CLOSURE | [2001/44] | French: | BOUCHON POUR BOUILLOTTE EN CAOUTCHOUC | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 14.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/38] | 28.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2005 | 31.01.2006 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.07.2006 | 31.01.2007 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.2007 | 31.01.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB141035 (SCHRADERS SON INC) [X] 1-3,6,7 * page 1, column R, line 63 - line 82; figures 1,2 * [A] 4; | [XA]US2622646 (MILLER DONALD J) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 3; figures 6,7 * [A] 4; | [XA]US2544929 (MADSEN PAUL S, et al) [X] 1-3,6,12 * column 2, line 38 - line 49; figures 5,6 * [A] 4; | [XA]US2500363 (KOEPPEL CHARLES H) [X] 1-4,7,13,15,16 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 9; figures 1,3 * [A] 8,14; | [XD]WO9106269 (TUCKER DALTON R [US], et al) [XD] 1 * page 4, line 8; figure 2 * | by applicant | DE480921 | DE474443 | DE29700310U | WO9106269 |