EP1153396 - METHOD FOR MAKING THIN ZIRCONIUM ALLOY ELEMENTS AND WAFERS OBTAINED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Framatome ANP Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | For all designated states Compagnie Européenne du Zirconium - CEZUS Tour Manhattan 6, place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Framatome ANP Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
For all designated states Compagnie Européenne du Zirconium - CEZUS Tour Manhattan 6, place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | |||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Compagnie Européenne du Zirconium CEZUS Tour Manhattan 6 place de l'Iris F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
For all designated states Compagnie Européenne du Zirconium CEZUS Tour Manhattan La Défense 2 6, place de l'Iris F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIZ, Jésus 5, rue Saint-Philippe F-69003 Lyon / FR | 02 /
BUNEL, Gérard 3, rue du Vieux Bourg F-61370 Echauffour / FR | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2001/46] | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00905127.7 | 14.02.2000 | [2001/46] | WO2000FR00357 | Priority number, date | FR19990001777 | 15.02.1999 Original published format: FR 9901777 | FR19990003955 | 30.03.1999 Original published format: FR 9903955 | [2001/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0048199 | Date: | 17.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153396 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1153396 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C22F1/18, C22C16/00, G21C3/07 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
G21C3/07 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | G21C3/07 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2003/25] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DÜNNEN ELEMENTEN AUS ZIRKONLEGIERUNG UND NACH DEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE PLÄTTCHEN | [2002/51] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING THIN ZIRCONIUM ALLOY ELEMENTS AND WAFERS OBTAINED | [2001/46] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ELEMENTS MINCES EN ALLIAGE A BASE DE ZIRCONIUM ET PLAQUETTES AINSI REALISEES | [2001/46] |
Former [2001/46] | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON DÜNNEN ELEMENTEN AUS ZIRKONLEGIERUNGEN UND NACH DEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE PLÄTTCHEN | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 05.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2013/46] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 18.06.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5925963 ; | [A]EP0246986 (CEZUS CO EUROP ZIRCONIUM [FR]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]FR2575764 (CEZUS CO EUROP ZIRCONIUM [FR]) [A] 1,6-13 * claims 1-3,8 *; | [A]US4992240 (KOMATSU KAZUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 5, line 15 - column 8, line 20; figures 5,6 *; | [A]FR2624136 (CEZUS CO EUROP ZIRCONIUM [FR]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,6-11,15 *; | [DA]EP0720177 (FRAMATOME SA [FR], et al) [DA] 1-7,9-13 * claims 1-8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840523), vol. 008, no. 110, Database accession no. (C - 224), & JP59025963 A 19840210 (SUMITOMO KINZOKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-3,6-13 * abstract * |