EP1163808 - MANAGEMENT OF MULTI-CONTEXT USER INTERFACES OF TELECOMMUNICATION TERMINALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOUDAILLE, Rémi 7, rue Guynemer F-35235 Thorigne-Fouillard / FR | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00905236.6 | 28.02.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000IB00238 | Priority number, date | EP19990460020 | 22.03.1999 Original published format: EP 99460020 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0057653 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163808 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/62, H04M3/42, H04M1/247, G06F9/44 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
H04Q3/627 (EP);
H04M1/2473 (EP);
H04M3/42314 (EP);
H04M3/42323 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG VON MULTIKONTEXT-BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHEN VON TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄTEN | [2001/51] | English: | MANAGEMENT OF MULTI-CONTEXT USER INTERFACES OF TELECOMMUNICATION TERMINALS | [2001/51] | French: | GESTION D'INTERFACES UTILISATEURS MULTICONTEXTES DE TERMINAUX DE TELECOMMUNICATION | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 01.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/10] | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5754636 (BAYLESS J A ET AL) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 36 * * column 7, line 38 - column 8, line 41; figure 1 * * column 10, line 6 - line 21 * * column 11, line 18 - line 29 * * column 11, line 47 - column 13, line 44 * * column 25, line 30 - column 26, line 34 * * column 29, line 61 - column 30, line 40 *; | [A]WO9848550 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 16 - page 3, line 4 * * page 7, line 1 - line 30 * * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 15 * * page 11, line 6 - line 21 *; | [A]US5572648 (BIBAYAN F) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 13 - line 22 * * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 24 * * column 4, line 9 - line 20 *; | [A]DE19534938 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 68 - column 4, line 5 *; | [A]US5371788 (BAALS K A ET AL) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 2 * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 42 * | [Y] - SCHROETER E ET AL, "AN APPLICATION INTERFACE WITH MULTIPLE WORKSPACES: THE CONTEXT SWITCHER", PROCEEDINGS OF 6TH AUSTRALIAN CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER-HUMAN INTERACTION, HAMILTON, NEW ZEALAND, 24-27 NOVEMBER 1996, pages 318 - 319, XP002105066 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * |