EP1081165 - METHOD OF DEHALOGENATING HYDROCARBON CONTAINING CARBON-CARBON DOUBLE BOND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS COMPANY, LIMITED 3-1, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8530 / JP | [2006/48] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Nippon Petrochemicals Company, Limited 3-1, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHASHI, Koichi 612-2, Kamihirama Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-0013 / JP | 02 /
TAKASHIMA, Tsutomu 3-23-1-503, Miyauchi Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-0051 / JP | 03 /
KUROKI, Teruhisa 3-23-1-208, Miyauchi Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-0051 / JP | 04 /
FUJIMURA, Koji 1-17-5, Okubo Kisarazu-shi Chiba 292-0815 / JP | 05 /
TOKUMOTO, Yuichi 1733-3, Kagawa Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 253-0082 / JP | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2001/10] | Application number, filing date | 00905293.7 | 23.02.2000 | [2001/10] | WO2000JP01036 | Priority number, date | JP19990044409 | 23.02.1999 Original published format: JP 4440999 | JP19990288366 | 08.10.1999 Original published format: JP 28836699 | JP19990308723 | 29.10.1999 Original published format: JP 30872399 | [2001/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0050472 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1081165 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1081165 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/26, C08F10/08, C08F4/14, C08F6/02 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
C08F10/10 (EP,US);
C08F8/26 (EP,KR,US);
C08F10/08 (EP,US);
C08F210/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/08, C08F4/14 (US,EP);
C08F8/26, C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F8/26, C08F10/08 (US,EP);
C08F210/08, C08F210/10 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2001/10] | C08F8/26, C08F10/08, C08F4/14 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DEHALOGENIERUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFHALTIGEN KOHLENSTOFF-KOHLENSTOFF DOPPELBINDUNGEN | [2001/10] | English: | METHOD OF DEHALOGENATING HYDROCARBON CONTAINING CARBON-CARBON DOUBLE BOND | [2001/10] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DESHALOGENER DES HYDROCARBURES CONTENANT UNE DOUBLE LIAISON CARBONE-CARBONE | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2000 | Translation filed | 13.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0671419 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [DY] 1-38 * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 6; claims 1-21 *; | [Y]JPH04110305 ; | [Y]CN1156152 ; | [Y]US3269997 (LYONS HAROLD D, et al) [Y] 1-38 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 46; claims 1-6 *; | [A]JPS6151009 ; | [A]EP0505992 (ENICHEM ANIC SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]DE2718699 (LION FAT OIL CO LTD) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 1; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US3205210 (JUNAS THOMAS B, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1026175 (NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1 * page 5, line 56 - page 6, line 4; claims 1-10 * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 21, Database accession no. 1992-172492, XP002310075 & JPH04110305 A 19920410 (ARAKAWA CHEM IND LTD) [Y] 1-38 * column A * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 37, Database accession no. 2001-344279, XP002310076 & CN1156152 A 19970806 (UNIV NANJING FOREST) [Y] 1-38 * column A * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 17, Database accession no. 1986-109268, XP002310077 & JPS6151009 A 19860313 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO LTD) [A] 1 * column A * | International search | [A]JPH04110305 (ARAKAWA CHEM IND); | [A]US4605808 (SAMSON JOHN N R [GB]) |