EP1157359 - IMAGE RENDERING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | Refusal of application | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Tadashi Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | 02 /
CUTHBERT, Simon Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00905303.4 | 24.02.2000 | [2001/48] | WO2000JP01048 | Priority number, date | JP19990053397 | 01.03.1999 Original published format: JP 5339799 | [2001/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0052640 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1157359 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40, G06T15/40 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
G06T3/4007 (EP,US);
G06T15/10 (KR);
G06T15/20 (EP,US);
G06T19/00 (KR);
H04N13/128 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDWIEDERGABE | [2001/48] | English: | IMAGE RENDERING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2001/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE RENDU D'IMAGE | [2001/48] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 04.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/03] | 30.11.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.12.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5365277 (GREGGAIN LANCE [CA]) [Y] 1-35 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5684939 (FORAN JAMES L [US], et al) [A] 5,6,18 * abstract *; | [A]WO9614621 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 7 * page 6, line 4 - page 9, line 15 * | [Y] - PRZEMYSLAW ROKITA, "FAST GENERATION OF DEPTH OF FIELD EFFECTS IN COMPUTER GRAPHICS", COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS,GB,PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD, (19930901), vol. 17, no. 5, ISSN 0097-8493, pages 593 - 595, XP000546559 [Y] 1-35 * abstract * * page 595, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0097-8493(93)90010-7 | [Y] - ASADA,N.; BABA, M.; AMANO,A., "Calibrated computer graphics : a new approach to realistic image synthesis based on camera calibration", PROC. 14TH INT. CONF. PAT. REC., Brisbane, Qld., Australia, (19980816), vol. 1, pages 705 - 707, XP002138638 [Y] 1-35 * abstract * * page 705, column L, paragraph 1 - column R, paragraph 2.2 * * page 706, column L, paragraph 1 - column R, paragraph 3 * |