EP1174774 - IMAGE HEATING DEVICE AND IMAGE FORMING DEVICE USED FOR THIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERADA, Hiroshi 8-25, Mayumi 4-chome Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0122 / JP | 02 /
IMAI, Masaru 53-4, Nasuzukuri 4-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0071 / JP | 03 /
TATEMATSU, Hideki 9-8-203, Takayanagi 3-chome Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0051 / JP | 04 /
TOYODA, Akinori 10-419, Ikuno 1-chome Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0054 / JP | 05 /
ASAKURA, Kenji 4-12-304, Ikuno Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0054 / JP | 06 /
WATANABE, Syuichi 10-5, Koushou, Hashimoto Yawata-shi, Kyoto 614-8323 / JP | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Schorr, Frank Jürgen Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Schorr, Frank, Dr. Diehl Glaeser Hiltl & Partner, Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00905416.4 | 29.02.2000 | [2002/04] | WO2000JP01179 | Priority number, date | JP19990054080 | 02.03.1999 Original published format: JP 5408099 | JP19990297760 | 20.10.1999 Original published format: JP 29776099 | [2002/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0052534 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1174774 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1174774 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
G03G15/2053 (EP,US);
G03G15/2064 (EP,US);
H05B6/145 (EP,US);
G03G2215/2016 (EP,US);
G03G2215/2032 (EP,US);
G03G2215/2041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2002/04] | Title | German: | BILDERWÄRMUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DAMIT AUSGERÜSTETE BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2002/04] | English: | IMAGE HEATING DEVICE AND IMAGE FORMING DEVICE USED FOR THIS | [2002/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE D'IMAGE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIE DE FORMATION D'IMAGE | [2002/04] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2001 | Translation filed | 02.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 04.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05025671.8 / EP1640819 | EP10180140.5 / EP2270610 | EP10180141.3 / EP2284626 | EP10180143.9 / EP2282238 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0816942 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,29-34,38,41-44 * figures 9,12 *; | [X]US5745833 (ABE ATSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,29-34,38,41-44 * figure 9 *; | [X]JPH10106739 ; | [E]EP1026556 (CANON KK [JP]) [E] 1,29-34,38,41-44 * figures 6,18 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10106739 A 19980424 (CANON INC) [X] 1,29-34,38,41-44 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5506666 (MASUDA SYUZOU [JP], et al); | [XE]JPH11297462 (CANON KK); | [XE]JPH11297463 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH09319243 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPH10106739 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH08129313 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH10184662 (RICOH KK); | [Y]US5752148 (YONEDA SATORU [JP], et al); | [X]JPH09197863 (MINOLTA CO LTD); | [X]US5819150 (HAYASAKI MINORU [JP], et al) |