EP1216255 - METHOD FOR NUCLEIC ACID ISOLATION AND KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HADDAD, Louis, C. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00905828.0 | 28.01.2000 | [2002/26] | WO2000US02260 | Priority number, date | US19990400037 | 21.09.1999 Original published format: US 400037 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0121632 | Date: | 29.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1216255 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1216255 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07H1/08 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
C12N15/1006 (EP,US);
Y10S977/924 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/31] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREN UND KIT | [2002/26] | English: | METHOD FOR NUCLEIC ACID ISOLATION AND KIT | [2002/26] | French: | PROCEDE D'ISOLEMENT D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET TROUSSE ASSOCIEE | [2002/26] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 17.06.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 30.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 26.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 28.10.2004 | [2005/10] | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4539256 (SHIPMAN GENE H [US]); | [DA]US4726989 (MROZINSKI JAMES S [US]); | [DA]US4906378 (HAGEN DONALD F [US], et al); | [A]WO9922021 (QIAGEN GES MIT BESCHRAENKTER H [DE], et al) |