EP1163198 - COMBINATION ION EXCHANGE RESIN BED FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF BISPHENOL A [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISSINGER, Gaylord, Michael 516 Pleasant View Drive Evansville, IN 47711 / US | 02 /
SHAFER, Sheldon, Jay 10 Mann Boulevard Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | 03 /
ACHARYA, Harish, R. 160 Oakbrook Commons Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | 04 /
PEEMANS, Rudy, François, Alan, J. Balkenstraat 60 B-3071 Erps-Kwerps / BE | 05 /
SCHLARMANN, Eduard Hof van Wezemaal 12 NL-4625 JP Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr. London Patent Operation, GE International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00905845.4 | 31.01.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000US02339 | Priority number, date | US19990258235 | 26.02.1999 Original published format: US 258235 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0050372 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163198 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1163198 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/20, C07C39/16, B01J8/02, B01J8/04, B01J47/00, B01J31/10 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
B01J31/10 (EP,US);
B01J8/04 (KR);
C07C37/20 (EP,US);
B01J2231/347 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/20, C07C39/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTES IONENAUSTAUSCHERBETT ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BISPHENOL-A | [2001/51] | English: | COMBINATION ION EXCHANGE RESIN BED FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF BISPHENOL A | [2001/51] | French: | LIT DE RESINE ECHANGEUSE D'IONS EN COMBINAISON POUR LA SYNTHESE DE BISPHENOL A | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 17.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.2003 | CH | 29.10.2003 | CY | 29.10.2003 | FI | 29.10.2003 | FR | 29.10.2003 | IT | 29.10.2003 | LI | 29.10.2003 | NL | 29.10.2003 | DK | 29.01.2004 | GR | 29.01.2004 | SE | 29.01.2004 | ES | 09.02.2004 | PT | 29.03.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 29.10.2003 | |
CH | 29.10.2003 | ||
CY | 29.10.2003 | ||
FI | 29.10.2003 | ||
FR | 29.10.2003 | ||
IT | 29.10.2003 | ||
LI | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 29.10.2003 | |
CH | 29.10.2003 | ||
CY | 29.10.2003 | ||
FI | 29.10.2003 | ||
FR | 29.10.2003 | ||
LI | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 29.10.2003 | |
CH | 29.10.2003 | ||
FI | 29.10.2003 | ||
FR | 29.10.2003 | ||
LI | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 29.10.2003 | |
CH | 29.10.2003 | ||
FI | 29.10.2003 | ||
LI | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 29.10.2003 | |
CH | 29.10.2003 | ||
FI | 29.10.2003 | ||
LI | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 29.10.2003 | |
CH | 29.10.2003 | ||
FI | 29.10.2003 | ||
LI | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 29.10.2003 | |
FI | 29.10.2003 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 29.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH0597741 ; | [A]EP0620041 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [DY]EP0621252 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DY] 2-7,9-17 * the whole document *; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 20, Database accession no. 1993-164393, XP002140161 & JPH0597741 A 19930420 (CHIYODA CORP) [X] 1,8 * abstract * [Y] 2-7,9-17 |