EP1155414 - ELECTROLUMINESCENT MULTILAYER OPTICAL INFORMATION STORAGE MEDIUM WITH INTEGRATED READOUT AND COMPOSITION OF MATTER FOR USE THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tri D Store IP, L.L.C. Eugene Levich, Ph., D, Suite 453, 230 Park Avenue New York, NY 10169 / US | [2001/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGNITSKI, Serguei Alexandrovitch Garibaldi ul. 9-76 Moscow, 117113 / RU | 02 /
DISKINE, Iossif Evgenievitch Sccherbakovskaya ul. 20/24-27 Moscow, 103518 / RU | 03 /
LEVICH, Eugene 235 West 76th Street, Suite 8D New York, NY 10023 / US | 04 /
MALKIN, Jacob Str. Hanavi Havakouke 13/2 77461 Ashdod / IL | 05 /
AVERBUCH, Orbach, Zeev 41B Zvi Segal Street, Barnea 78483 Ashqelon / IL | 06 /
CHERNOBROD, Boris Str. Haim Laskov 11/11 76654 Rehovot / IL | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Solf, Alexander Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Solf, Alexander, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00906025.2 | 14.02.2000 | [2001/47] | WO2000US03539 | Priority number, date | US19990119902P | 12.02.1999 Original published format: US 119902 P | [2001/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0048197 | Date: | 17.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1155414 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11C13/04, G11C11/42 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
G11B7/0938 (EP,US);
G11B7/0033 (EP,US);
G11B7/005 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (EP,US);
G11B7/124 (EP,US);
G11C11/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ELEKTROLUMINESZIERENDES, MEHRSCHICHTIGES, OPTISCHES INFORMATIONSSPEICHERMEDIUM MIT INTEGRIETER AUSLESEVORRICHTUNG UND SEINE MATERIALZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2001/47] | English: | ELECTROLUMINESCENT MULTILAYER OPTICAL INFORMATION STORAGE MEDIUM WITH INTEGRATED READOUT AND COMPOSITION OF MATTER FOR USE THEREIN | [2001/47] | French: | SUPPORT MULTICOUCHE ELECTROLUMINESCENT D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DONNEES OPTIQUES A INDICATEUR INTEGRE, ET COMPOSITION DE MATIERE DESTINEE A ETRE UTILISEE DANS LEDIT SUPPORT | [2001/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/51] | 17.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9637888 (OPTICOM AS [NO], et al) [X] 5 * the whole document * [Y] 1,3; | [YA]US5703436 (FORREST STEPHEN R [US], et al) [Y] 1,3 * column 3, line 1 - line 22 * * column 4, line 28 - column 7, line 48 * * figure 2 * [A] 6; | [A]US5792561 (ZYUNG TAE-HYOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 3,5 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 67 *; | [A]US5568417 (FURUKI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 3,5 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 31 *; | [A]GB1298462 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 3,5 * page 1, line 25 - page 3, line 18 *; | [A]US5416494 (YOKOTA MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 12, line 40 - column 13, line 2 * * figure 9 * |