EP1157231 - THERMOSTATIC VALVE TOP PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danfoss A/S 6430 Nordborg / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Danfoss A/S 6430 Nordborg / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREDERIKSEN, Bjarne Nisset S nderhede 4 DK-8600 Silkeborg / DK | [2001/48] | Application number, filing date | 00906182.1 | 29.02.2000 | [2001/48] | WO2000DK00083 | Priority number, date | DE1999109096 | 02.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19909096 | [2001/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0052372 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1157231 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1157231 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/68, // (G05D23/12, F24D19:10) | [2001/48] | CPC: |
G05D23/023 (EP);
G05D23/1925 (EP);
F24D3/12 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [2003/24] |
Former [2001/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | THERMOSTAT KOPFTEIL EINES VENTILS | [2001/48] | English: | THERMOSTATIC VALVE TOP PART | [2001/48] | French: | PARTIE SUPERIEURE D'UNE SOUPAPE THERMOSTATIQUE | [2001/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 13.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 29.02.2004 | LI | 29.02.2004 | [2004/51] | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4319814 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) [X] 1-3 * pos. K,13,14; column 3, line 11 - line 18 *; | [A]DE19534186 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) [A] 1 |