EP1146897 - USE OF A MELANOMA INHIBITING ACTIVITY FACTOR (MIA) FOR CARTILAGE AND BONE REPAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dony, Carola Engelstrasse 7 81477 München / DE | [2001/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONY, Carola Engelstrasse 7 D-81477 München / DE | 02 /
PROETZEL, Gabriele Adenauerplatz 1 D-97523 Schwanfeld / DE | 03 /
LESER-REIFF, ULRIKE Elisabethstrasse 26 D-80796 München / DE | [2001/44] |
Former [2001/43] | 01 /
DONY, Carola Engelstrasse 7 D-81477 München / DE | ||
02 /
PROETZEL, Gabriele Adenauerplatz 1 D-97523 Schwanfeld / DE | |||
03 /
LESER, Ulrike Elisabethstrasse 26 D-80796 München / DE | Representative(s) | Huber, Bernhard, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00906234.0 | 27.01.2000 | [2001/43] | WO2000EP00623 | Priority number, date | EP19990101315 | 28.01.1999 Original published format: EP 99101315 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0044401 | Date: | 03.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1146897 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1146897 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/57, C07K14/47, A61L27/22, A61L27/54, A61P19/00 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
A61L26/0028 (EP,US);
A61L27/227 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/43] | A61K38/57, C07K14/47, A61L27/22, A61L27/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON MELANOMHEMMENDEM FAKTOR ZUR REPARATUR VON KNORPELGEWEBE UND KNOCHEN | [2001/43] | English: | USE OF A MELANOMA INHIBITING ACTIVITY FACTOR (MIA) FOR CARTILAGE AND BONE REPAIR | [2001/43] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN FACTEUR D'ACTIVITE INHIBITRICE DE MELANOME (MIA) POUR LA REPARATION DE CARTILAGES ET D'OS | [2001/43] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 12.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9209697 (CELTRIX LAB INC [US]) [DA] 1-10 * claim - *; | [DX]WO9503328 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1 * page 11; claim 20 *; | [DA]WO9830234 (IWAMOTO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [DA] 1-10 * examples 1-7; claims 1,2 *; | [A] - BOSSERHOFF A-K ET AL, "Structure and promoter analysis of the gene encoding the human melanoma-inhibiting protein MIA", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19960105), vol. 271, no. 1, pages 490 - 495, XP002087912 [A] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.1.490 | [A] - BOSSERHOFF A -K ET AL, "MELANOMA-INHIBITING ACTIVITY, A NOVEL SERUM MARKER FOR PROGRESSION OF MALIGNANT MELANOMA", CANCER RESEARCH, (19970801), vol. 57, no. 15, pages 3149 - 3153, XP002060476 [A] 1 |