EP1149221 - PADLOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASTER LOCK COMPANY 2600 North 32nd Street Milwaukee, WI 53210 / US | [2001/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHASTAIN, David, P. 21 Washington Drive Acton, MA 21720 / US | 02 /
FIEGENER, John, D. 1 Nicholson Hill Marblehead, Massachusetts 01945 / US | 03 /
THOMPSON, Roy, A. 45 Wellington Hill Street Mattapan, MA 02126 / US | 04 /
GERINGER, Joseph, R. 7 Kinsman Lane Merrimack, New Hampshire 03054 / US | 05 /
WEST, Harry 56 Vine Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 06 /
ADLER, Ari, T. Apartment 2104 195 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 07 /
FINIW, Maryann 357 Commercial Street Boston, MA 02109 / US | 08 /
KAJUCH, Pete 2445 Mayfair Drive Brookfield, WI 53005 / US | 09 /
MARCELLE, Jesse, A. 8141 South Forest Meadows Drive Franklin, WI 53132 / US | [2002/03] |
Former [2001/44] | 01 /
CHASTAIN, David, P. 21 Washington Drive Acton, MA 21720 / US | ||
02 /
FIEGENER, John, D. 45 North Avenue Mendon, MA 01756 / US | |||
03 /
THOMPSON, Roy, A. 45 Wellington Hill Street Mattapan, MA 02126 / US | |||
04 /
GERINGER, Joseph, R. 36 Fairview Avenue Melrose, MA 02176 / US | |||
05 /
WEST, Harry 56 Vine Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | |||
06 /
ADLER, Ari, T. Apartment 2104 195 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
07 /
FINIW, Maryann 357 Commercial Street Boston, MA 02109 / US | |||
08 /
KAJUCH, Pete 2445 Mayfair Drive Brookfield, WI 53005 / US | |||
09 /
MARCELLE, Jesse, A. 8141 South Forest Meadows Drive Franklin, WI 53132 / US | Representative(s) | Neill, Alastair William, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Neill, Alastair William, et al Appleyard Lees & Co. 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 00906988.1 | 21.01.2000 | [2001/44] | WO2000US01572 | Priority number, date | US19990235338 | 22.01.1999 Original published format: US 235338 | [2001/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0043623 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1149221 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.07.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E05B67/30, E05B67/04 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
E05B67/04 (EP,US);
E05B67/28 (EP,KR,US);
E05B17/0054 (EP,US);
E05B17/185 (EP,US);
E05B17/186 (EP,US);
E05B2067/025 (EP,US);
Y10T70/457 (EP,US);
Y10T70/489 (EP,US);
Y10T70/498 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7921 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/44] | E05B67/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORHÄNGESCHLOSS | [2001/44] | English: | PADLOCK | [2001/44] | French: | CADENAS | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 31.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/08] | 04.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/08] | Divisional application(s) | EP10184066.8 / EP2320011 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE246104 (DUBINSKY B.M.) [X] 21 * the whole document * [A] 16,19; | [X]DE346103 (KRACHT H.) [X] 21 * the whole document *; | [X]US823919 (CALDWELL YANCEY Q [US]) [X] 21* the whole document *; | [X]DE625887 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]FR1163273 (VACHETTE ETS) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]US3848440 (MANUEL L, et al) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [X]DE8004739U (RAUKAMP GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 19 - page 4, line 32; figure - *; | [DA]US4998423 (HSU FONG S [TW]) [DA] 16-18 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5044180 (LEBRECHT HORST [US]) [DA] 16-18 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]DE346103 ; | [X]US823919 (CALDWELL YANCEY Q [US]); | [X]US1003331 (CALDWELL YANCEY Q [US]); | [Y]US1062594 (ISIDOR JOSEPH S [US]); | [X]US1153405 (ROGERS JOESIRE S [US]); | [Y]US2874563 (SCHLAGE ERNEST L); | [X]US3848440 (MANUEL L, et al); | [Y]US3983725 (MANUEL LARRY N, et al); | [Y]US4372138 (DE FORREST WILLIAM E [US]); | [X]US4464915 (MOSHE DOLEV [IL], et al); | [Y]US4790163 (APPELBAUM PAUL [US]); | [Y]US4899560 (CHEN CHANG-YU [TW]); | [X]US5046339 (KRELL DARRNELL D [US]) | by applicant | US8318 | US116972 | US952643 | US1062594 | FR638078 | GB571487 | US2491337 | US2874563 | US3267707 | DE1780397 | US4567740 | US4998423 | US5044180 | US5146771 | US5548981 | US5611225 |