EP1220946 - METHODS OF UTILIZING THE TT VIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES CHAD 0377/AP6D-2 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US | ||
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES CHAD-0377, AP6D/2, One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-2204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEARY, Thomas, P. 6820 107th Avenue Kenosha, WI 53142 / US | 02 /
SIMONS, John, N. 738 N. Allegheny Road Grayslake, IL 60030 / US | 03 /
ERKER, James, C. 359 N. White Tail Drive Hainsville, IL 60030 / US | 04 /
CHALMERS, Michele, L. 21924 W. Linden Avenue Lake Villa, IL 60046 / US | 05 /
BIRKENMEYER, Larry, G. 5303 W. Leland Chicago, IL 60630 / US | 06 /
MUERHOFF, A., Scott 121 68th Place Kenosha, WI 53143 / US | 07 /
PILOT-MATIAS, Tami, J. 2100 Cranbrook Road Green Oaks, IL 60048 / US | 08 /
DESAI, Suresh, M. 1408 Amy Lane Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | 09 /
MUSHAHWAR, Isa, K. 18790 Arbor Boulevard Grayslake, IL 60030 / US | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/28] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00907172.1 | 04.02.2000 | [2002/28] | WO2000US02982 | Priority number, date | US19990245248 | 05.02.1999 Original published format: US 245248 | [2002/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0046407 | Date: | 10.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1220946 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70, C12N5/10, C12N15/86 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
C12Q1/701 (EP,US);
Y10S977/804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/28] | Title | German: | METHODEN ZUR BENUTZUNG DES TT-VIRUS | [2002/28] | English: | METHODS OF UTILIZING THE TT VIRUS | [2002/28] | French: | PROCEDES RELATIFS A L'UTILISATION DU VIRUS TT | [2002/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.07.2001 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 16.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.10.2008 | 19.05.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/44] | 16.06.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/44] | 10.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Request for further processing for: | 14.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.01.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9905282 (TAMURA RYOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * see abstract *; | [E]EP1010759 (TAMURA RYOJI [JP]) [E] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9958638 (INNOGENETICS NV [BE], et al) [PX] 1-4 * claims 1-20 * | [X] - NISHIZAWA T ET AL, "A novel DNA virus (TTV) associated withelevated transaminase levels in posttransfusion hepatitis of unknown etiology", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (19971208), vol. 241, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 92 - 97, XP002080817 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1997.7765 | [X] - OKAMOTO H ET AL, "MOLECULAR CLONING AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A NOVEL DNA VIRUS (TTV) ASSOCIATED WITH POSTTRANSFUSION HEPATITIS OF UNKNOWN ETIOLOGY", HEPATOLOGY RESEARCH, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1998), vol. 10, no. 1, ISSN 1386-6346, pages 1 - 16, XP000892167 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1386-6346(97)00123-X | [X] - TAKAHASHI K ET AL, "PARTIAL - 2.4-KB SEQUENCES OF TT VIRUS (TTV) GENOME FROM EIGHT JAPANESE ISOLATES: DIAGNOSTIC AND PHYLOGENETIC IMPLICATIONS", HEPATOLOGY RESEARCH, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1998), vol. 12, ISSN 1386-6346, pages 111 - 120, XP000914984 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1386-6346(98)00042-4 | [X] - SIMMONDS P ET AL, "Detection of a novel DNA virus (TTV) in blood donors and blood products", LANCET THE, LANCET LIMITED. LONDON, GB, (19980718), vol. 352, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 191 - 197, XP002128309 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(98)03056-6 |