EP1153124 - METHODS TO MEDIATE POLYKETIDE SYNTHASE MODULE EFFECTIVENESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of The Leland Stanford Junior University 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | ||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY 900 Welch Road, Suite 350 Palo Alto, CA 94304-1850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOKHALE, Rajesh, S. 88 Sadar Apartments, Mayur Vihar Phase I (Extn) Delhi 110091 / IN | 02 /
TSUJI, Stuart, Y. 32 Angell Court Apt A Stanford, CA 94305 / US | 03 /
KHOSLA, Chaitan 740 La Para Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/46] | 01 /
GOKHALE, Rajesh, S. 88 Sadar Apartments, Mayur Vihar Phase I (Extn) Delhi 110091 / IN | ||
02 /
TSUJI, Stuart, Y. 121 Campus Drive Stanford, CA 94305 / US | |||
03 /
KHOSLA, Chaitan 740 La Para Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Representative(s) | Roques, Sarah Elizabeth, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Roques, Sarah Elizabeth, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/46] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00907235.6 | 09.02.2000 | [2001/46] | WO2000US03345 | Priority number, date | US19990119363P | 09.02.1999 Original published format: US 119363 P | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0047724 | Date: | 17.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1153124 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/00 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
C12N9/93 (EP,US);
C12P19/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MODULIERUNG DER EFFIZIENZ VON POLYKETIDE SYNTASE MODULEN | [2001/46] | English: | METHODS TO MEDIATE POLYKETIDE SYNTHASE MODULE EFFECTIVENESS | [2001/46] | French: | PROCEDES DE MODULATION DE L'EFFICACITE DE MODULES DE POLYKETIDE-SYNTHASES | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 29.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/36] | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9714789 (GENENCOR INT [US]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9801546 (BIOTICA TECH LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9854308 (BIOTICA TECH LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [X] - BAO W ET AL, "Reconstitution of the iterative type II polyketide synthase for tetracenomycin F2 biosynthesis", BIOCHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA, (199806), vol. 37, no. 22, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 8132 - 8138, XP002130659 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi980466i | [X] - KAKAVAS S J ET AL, "Identification and characterization of the niddamycin polyketide synthase genes from Streptomyces caelestis", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY,US,WASHINGTON, DC, (199712), vol. 179, no. 23, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 7515 - 7522, XP002130645 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * | [X] - BEDFORD D ET AL, "A FUNCTIONAL CHIMERIC MODULAR POLYKETIDE SYNTHASE GENERATED VIA DOMAIN REPLACEMENT", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY,GB,CURRENT BIOLOGY, LONDON, (199610), vol. 3, no. 10, ISSN 1074-5521, pages 827 - 831, XP000884261 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(96)90068-X | [X] - KHOSLA C, "Harnessing the biosynthetic potential of modular polyketide synthases", CHEMICAL REVIEWS,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, (1997), vol. 97, no. 7, ISSN 0009-2665, pages 2577 - 2590, XP002130646 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr960027u | [X] - MCDANIEL R ET AL, "ENGINEERED INTERMODULAR AND INTRAMODULAR POLYKETIDE SYNTHASE FUSIONS", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY,GB,CURRENT BIOLOGY, LONDON, (199709), vol. 4, no. 9, ISSN 1074-5521, pages 667 - 674, XP000884811 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(97)90222-2 |