EP1156814 - PHARMACEUTICALS, DIETARY SUPPLEMENTS AND COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A FATTY ACID AND GINGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/48] | NOVEL PHARMACEUTICALS, DIETARY SUPPLEMENTS AND COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS, AND THE USE OF CERTAIN MIXTURES FOR PREPARING A MEDICAMENT OR A DIETARY SUPPLEMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF INFLAMMATION, HYPERSENSITIVITY REACTIONS OR PAIN | ||
[2003/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROVITA A/S Svejsegangen 4 2690 Karlslunde / DK | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Ida Royalty APS Fruebjergvej 3 2100 Copenhagen / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIDNER, Morten, Sloth Solbakken 7 DK-2830 Virum / DK | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Nyeng, Joergen, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Nyeng, Joergen, et al Hofman-Bang Zacco A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 00907455.0 | 02.03.2000 | [2001/48] | WO2000DK00087 | Priority number, date | DK19990000293 | 03.03.1999 Original published format: DK 29399 | [2001/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0051576 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1156814 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1156814 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/78, A61K31/232, A61P37/08 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
A61K36/9068 (EP,US);
A61P37/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/9068, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 17.09.2001 | LV | 17.09.2001 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 17.09.2001 | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL, NAHRUNGSZUSÄTZE UND KOSMETISCHE ZUBEREITUNG ENTHALTEND EINE FETTSÄURE UND INGWER | [2003/06] | English: | PHARMACEUTICALS, DIETARY SUPPLEMENTS AND COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A FATTY ACID AND GINGER | [2003/06] | French: | PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES, SUPPLEMENTS ALIMENTAIRES ET COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES COMPRENNANT UN ACIDE GRAS ET DU GINGEMBRE | [2003/06] |
Former [2001/48] | ARZNEIMITTEL, NAHRUNGSZUSÄTZE UND KOSMETISCHE ZUBEREITUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ARZEIMITTELS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INFLAMMATIONEN, HYPERSENSIVITÄTEN ODER SCHMERZ | ||
Former [2001/48] | NOVEL PHARMACEUTICALS, DIETARY SUPPLEMENTS AND COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS, AND THE USE OF CERTAIN MIXTURES FOR PREPARING A MEDICAMENT OR A DIETARY SUPPLEMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF INFLAMMATION, HYPERSENSITIVITY REACTIONS OR PAIN | ||
Former [2001/48] | NOUVEAUX PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES, SUPPLEMENTS ALIMENTAIRES ET COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES, ET UTILISATION DE CERTAINS MELANGES POUR PREPARER UN MEDICAMENT OU UN SUPPLEMENT ALIMENTAIRE AFIN DE TRAITER OU DE PREVENIR UNE INFLAMMATION, DES REACTIONS D'HYPERSENSIBILITE OU UNE DOULEUR | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Request for further processing for: | 17.06.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 17.06.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.07.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 02.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/02] | MC | 31.03.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH07267856 ; | [Y]JPH01180822 ; | [A]JPS448561B ; | [A]WO9631457 (SCOTIA HOLDINGS PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9806276 (LMA S A [FR], et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 50, Database accession no. 1995-390227, XP002901119 & JPH07267856 A 19951017 (GREEN CROSS CORP) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 34, Database accession no. 1989-246405, XP002901120 & JPH01180822 A 19890718 (DAINIPPON PHARM CO LTD) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * | [A] - "Extraction of an active component in zingiber", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1968, no. 00, Database accession no. 1966-37429f, XP002901121 & JPS448561B B1 00000000 (TOYODA K) [A] 1-19 * abstract * |