EP1176146 - CARBAMOYL TETRAHYDROPYRIDINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8633 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8633 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAZATO, Atsuro Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., 3-2-4-1, Takata Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8633 / JP | 02 /
OKUBO, Taketoshi Taisho Pharm. Co., Ltd., 2-4-1, Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP | 03 /
KUMAGAI, Toshihito Taisho Pharm. Co., Ltd., 24-1, Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP | 04 /
TOMISAWA, Kazuyuki Taisho Pharm. Co., Ltd., 24-1, Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00907999.7 | 10.03.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000JP01468 | Priority number, date | JP19990065004 | 11.03.1999 Original published format: JP 6500499 | JP19990185628 | 30.06.1999 Original published format: JP 18562899 | JP19990258353 | 13.09.1999 Original published format: JP 25835399 | [2002/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0053604 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1176146 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1176146 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/34, C07D487/04, C07D211/78, C07D207/34, A61K31/52, A61K31/519, A61P43/00, A61P25/24, A61P25/22, A61P25/28, A61P25/16, A61P25/30, A61P25/08, A61P1/00, A61P7/10, A61P9/10, A61P9/12, A61P17/02, A61P29/00, A61P37/02 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/05] | Title | German: | CARBAMOYLTETRAHYDROPYRIDIN-DERIVATE | [2002/05] | English: | CARBAMOYL TETRAHYDROPYRIDINE DERIVATIVES | [2002/05] | French: | DERIVES DE CARBAMOYL TETRAHYDROPYRIDINE | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2001 | Translation filed | 11.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 06.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04005593.1 / EP1449843 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2005 | CY | 08.06.2005 | FI | 08.06.2005 | NL | 08.06.2005 | DK | 08.09.2005 | GR | 08.09.2005 | SE | 08.09.2005 | PT | 14.11.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2006/26] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 08.06.2005 | |
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 08.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]EP0976745 (TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-4,7* the whole document * | International search | [X]US4229453 (ROTH HERMANN J, et al); | [A]WO9413676 (PFIZER [US], et al); | [AP]JPH11335376 (TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD ); | [AP]JP2000086663 (TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD ); | [X] - DEREK H. R. BARTON, ET. AL., "OXYDATION OF SECANDARY AMINES TO alpha CYANOAMINES.", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1985), vol. 26, no. 9, pages 1229 - 1233, XP002928088 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)98440-5 | [A] - JOHN W. DALY, "7-DEAZA-9-PHENYLADENINES, A NEW CLASS OF ADENOSINE RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS.", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (1988), vol. 37, no. 19, pages 3749 - 3753, XP002928089 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(88)90410-8 |