EP1081157 - PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION OF STEROID DERIVATIVES, INTERMEDIATES THEREFOR AND PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION OF THE INTERMEDIATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-8622 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-8622 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUJI, Yoshihisa, Kuraray Co., Ltd. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 02 /
MITANI, Toshimichi, Kuraray Co., Ltd. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00908057.3 | 14.03.2000 | [2001/10] | WO2000JP01535 | Priority number, date | JP19990075490 | 19.03.1999 Original published format: JP 7549099 | [2001/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0056759 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1081157 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07J9/00, C07J31/00, C07J71/00 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
C07J9/00 (EP,US);
C07J31/006 (EP,US);
C07J71/0042 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/10] | C07J9/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI [2004/22] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STEROID-DERIVATEN, ZWISCHENPRODUKTE ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER ZWISCHENPRODUKTE | [2001/10] | English: | PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION OF STEROID DERIVATIVES, INTERMEDIATES THEREFOR AND PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION OF THE INTERMEDIATES | [2001/10] | French: | PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE DERIVES DE STEROIDES, LEURS INTERMEDIAIRES, ET PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE CES INTERMEDIAIRES | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2000 | Translation filed | 15.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 17.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/14] | 27.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPH0413695 [ ] (KURARAY CO) [ ] * An automated computer translation of this Japanese publication can be found on the website of the Japanese Patent Office: http://www.ipdl.ncipi.go.jp/homepg_e.ipdl *; | [Y] - ANDO, YOSHINORI ET AL, "Preparation of 27-nor-1.alpha.,3.beta.-dihydroxycholesta-5,7-dien-25- ones", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1992:426921, URL: STN, XP002322880 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * | [Y] - TACHIBANA, YOJI, "Synthesis of 1.alpha.,3.beta.-dihydroxy-2.beta.-(3-hydroxypropoxy)- 5,7-choladiene derivative and its application to the synthesis of 1.alpha.,25-dihydroxy-2.beta.-(3-hydroxypropoxy)vitamin D3", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1996:70583, URL: STN, XP002322881 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * | [ ] - NIPPON KAGAKU KAISHI , (1), 91-6 CODEN: NKAKB8; ISSN: 0369-4577, (1996), XP008045029 [ ] * page 92, scheme 3 ; page 93, scheme 4 * | International search | [A]US4723045 (TACHIBANA YOJI [JP]); | [A]US4287129 (KLAUSMEIER WILLIAM H, et al); | [A]JPH08217789 (SUMITOMO PHARMA) |