EP1163470 - SELF-ADHESIVE INSULATION BLANKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | Change - rejection of opposition | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwool Lapinus B.V. Industrieweg 15 6045 JG Roermond / NL | [2001/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ETTEMA, Antonius, Maria De Kaanjel 3 NL-6049 KV Herten / NL | 02 /
KABO, Pascal, Anne, Frederic Parallelweg 51 NL-6301 XZ Valkenburg a/d Geul / NL | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2001/51] | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00908117.5 | 03.03.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000NL00134 | Priority number, date | NL19991011603 | 19.03.1999 Original published format: NL 1011603 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0057101 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163470 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1163470 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/02, E04B1/78, F24F13/02, F24F13/24 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
F24F13/0218 (EP);
E04B1/7662 (EP);
E04B1/78 (EP);
F16L59/026 (EP);
F24F13/0245 (EP);
F24F13/0263 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTKLEBENDE ISOLIERUNGSDECKE | [2001/51] | English: | SELF-ADHESIVE INSULATION BLANKET | [2001/51] | French: | COUVERTURE ISOLANTE AUTO-ADHESIVE | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 15.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2006
12.06.2006
ADMISSIBLE SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR Opponent's representative Jamet, Vincent, et al, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2006
SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR Opponent's representative Jamet, Vincent, et al, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche, 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 16.06.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.10.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/38] | 25.04.2008 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/37] | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.04.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.08.2005 | FI | 10.08.2005 | IT | 10.08.2005 | DK | 10.11.2005 | GR | 10.11.2005 | SE | 10.11.2005 | ES | 21.11.2005 | PT | 10.01.2006 | GB | 03.03.2006 | IE | 03.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | BE | 31.03.2007 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/04] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
IT | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
GB | 03.03.2006 | ||
IE | 03.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
IT | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
GB | 03.03.2006 | ||
IE | 03.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
GB | 03.03.2006 | ||
IE | 03.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
IE | 03.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 10.08.2005 | |
SE | 10.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [YA]NL7206406 (A/S ROCKWOOL) [Y] 7 * the whole document * [A] 1,4; | [A]GB2099786 (BRITAINS LTD) [A] 8-10,14,21 * abstract * * page 2, line 66 - page 3, line 108 *; | [XA]US5419859 (HARTMAN DAVID [CA], et al) [X] 17,19 * abstract * * column 4, line 19 - column 11, line 62 * [A] 1,4,8; | [XA]CA2147443 (SCHULLER INT INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,8 * abstract * * page 4, line 3 - page 8, line 5 * [A] 13,17,21; | [A]WO9711841 (WHITE TIMOTHY PLATT [GB]) [A] 9,10,16* abstract *; | [XAY]US5868891 (WEIR CHARLES RUSSELL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8 * abstract * * column 3, line 59 - column 9, line 3 * [A] 5,13,17,21 [Y] 7 | Examination | US5685938 |