EP1165346 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A LAMP OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maijers, Richard Cornelis 33, Rembrandtlaan 5161 ER Sprang-Capelle / NL | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Griebling, Onno Octrooibureau Griebling BV Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Griebling, Onno Octrooibureau Griebling BV Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL | Application number, filing date | 00908122.5 | 03.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000NL00139 | Priority number, date | NL19991011534 | 11.03.1999 Original published format: NL 1011534 | [2002/01] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0053455 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1165346 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/38 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
B60Q1/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR LAMPENSTEUERUNG EINES KRAFTFAHZEUGES | [2002/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A LAMP OF A VEHICLE | [2002/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UN FEU DE VEHICULE | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2000 | Translation filed | 10.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 05.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/14] | Request for further processing for: | 05.01.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.03.2004 | Decision despatched | 18.12.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5599433 ; | [A]US3596244 (LITKE BERNHARDT J) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US4322715 (MOON CHARLES G) [A] 1 * column 1; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4591824 (LOMEN JOHN J [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2190553 (ALL CAR ELECTRICS) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801016), vol. 004, no. 147, Database accession no. (M - 036), & JP55099433 A 19800729 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |