EP1153519 - A METHOD FOR SECURE HANDOVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOREFORS, Arne Hantverkargatan 44 S-112 21 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
CHENG, Yi Armegatan 32, 915 S-171 71 Solna / SE | 03 /
ALMEHAG, Lorens Majrovägen 29 S-122 45 Enskede / SE | 04 /
JERRESTAM, Dan Arkövägen 17 S-121 55 Johanneshov / SE | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00908172.0 | 08.02.2000 | [2001/46] | WO2000SE00249 | Priority number, date | US19990251396 | 17.02.1999 Original published format: US 251396 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0049827 | Date: | 24.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153519 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1153519 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
H04W12/10 (EP,US);
H04L63/126 (EP,US);
H04L2463/061 (EP,US);
H04L63/0807 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W12/61 (EP,US);
H04W36/0038 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN VERFAHREN FÜR SICHERE WEITERREICHUNG | [2001/46] | English: | A METHOD FOR SECURE HANDOVER | [2001/46] | French: | PROCEDURE POUR SECURISER LE TRANSFERT | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 12.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 02.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2006 | BE | 03.05.2006 | CH | 03.05.2006 | CY | 03.05.2006 | FI | 03.05.2006 | IT | 03.05.2006 | LI | 03.05.2006 | NL | 03.05.2006 | DK | 03.08.2006 | SE | 03.08.2006 | GR | 04.08.2006 | PT | 03.10.2006 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 03.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5598459 (HAARTSEN JACOBUS C [SE]) |