EP1155343 - ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE RESISTIVITY TOOL HAVING TILTED ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2017/02] |
Former [2015/28] | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | ||
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. 2601 Belt Line Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | ||
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 2601 Beltline Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | ||
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states Dresser Industries Inc. 2001 Ross Avenue Dallas, Texas 75201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BITTAR, Michael, S. 8711 Wheatland Drive Houston, TX 77064 / US | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Michael John AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/02] | Jennings, Michael John A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | ||
Former [2011/48] | Jennings, Michael John A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Curtis, Philip Anthony, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | Curtis, Philip Anthony, et al A A Thornton & Co Chemical 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2007/40] | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2006/24] | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2001/47] | Naismith, Robert Stewart, Dr., et al CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00908351.0 | 24.01.2000 | [2001/47] | WO2000US01693 | Priority number, date | US19990238832 | 28.01.1999 Original published format: US 238832 | [2001/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0045195 | Date: | 03.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1155343 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1155343 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1155343 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/28, G01V3/38 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
G01V3/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/47] | G01V3/26, G01V3/30, G01V3/38 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2017/02] |
Former [2004/20] | FR, GB | ||
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR WIDERSTANDSMESSUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER WELLEN UND EINER GENEIGTEN ANTENNE | [2001/47] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE RESISTIVITY TOOL HAVING TILTED ANTENNA | [2001/47] | French: | OUTIL DE MESURE DE RESISTIVITE AU MOYEN D'ONDES ELECTROMAGNETIQUES, MUNI D'UNE ANTENNE INCLINEE | [2001/47] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 02.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09166404.5 / EP2110687 | EP09166405.2 / EP2108981 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.12.2011
13.12.2011
WITHDRAWN SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 110 Schlumberger Drive Sugarland TX 77478 / US Opponent's representative V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2016/24] |
Former [2015/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.12.2011
13.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 110 Schlumberger Drive Sugarland TX 77478 / US Opponent's representative V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2012/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.12.2011
13.12.2011
ADMISSIBLE SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 110 Schlumberger Drive Sugarland TX 77478 / US Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | 17.01.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.07.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.04.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.06.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.06.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 29.11.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.02.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 12.02.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0814349 (ANADRILL INT SA [PA], et al) [X] 1,11,28 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0840142 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [DA] 1,11,28 * abstract *; | [DA] - HAGIWARA T, "A NEW METHOD TO DETERMINE HORIZONTAL-RESISTIVITY IN ANISOTROPIC FORMATIONS WITHOUT PRIOR KNOWLEDGE OF RELATIVE DIP", TRANSACTIONS OF THE SPWLA ANNUAL LOGGING SYMPOSIUM, TEXAS, US, (19960616), page COMPLETE, XP000972064 [DA] 1,11,28 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US3014177 (HUNGERFORD ERNEST T, et al); | [A]US3187252 (HUNGERFORD ERNEST T); | [A]US3808520 (RUNGE R); | [A]US4302722 (GIANZERO STANLEY); | [AE]US6044325 (CHAKRAVARTHY SRINIVASA [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9401791 | - TIANFEI ZHU; LARRY D. BROWN, "Two-dimensional Velocity Inversion and Synthetic Seismogram Computation", GEOPHYSICS, (198701), vol. 52, no. 1, pages 37 - 50 |