EP1144433 - METHOD FOR COMBINATORIAL MATERIALS DEVELOPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Combimatrix Corporation Suite 210, 887 Mitten Road Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Combimatrix Corporation Suite 210, 887 Mitten Road Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Brooke, P. 9134 134th Court NE Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
MONTGOMERY, Donald, D. 1410 Millbrae Avenue 306 Millbrae, CA 94030 / US | [2002/01] |
Former [2001/42] | 01 /
ANDERSON, Brooke, P. 1410 Millbrae Avenue 105 Millbrae, CA 94030 / US | ||
02 /
MONTGOMERY, Donald, D. 1410 Millbrae Avenue 306 Millbrae, CA 94030 / US | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr. Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00908387.4 | 25.01.2000 | [2001/42] | WO2000US01998 | Priority number, date | US19990116955P | 25.01.1999 Original published format: US 116955 P | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0043411 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1144433 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/04, C07H21/00, C07K1/00, G06F17/50 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
C07K1/047 (EP);
B01J19/0046 (EP);
C07K1/00 (EP);
B01J2219/00378 (EP);
B01J2219/00387 (EP);
B01J2219/00695 (EP);
B01J2219/00713 (EP);
B01J2219/0072 (EP);
B01J2219/00722 (EP);
B01J2219/00725 (EP);
B01J2219/00745 (EP);
B01J2219/00747 (EP);
B01J2219/00752 (EP);
C40B30/08 (EP);
C40B40/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTWICKLUNG VON KOMBINATORISCHEN STOFFEN | [2001/42] | English: | METHOD FOR COMBINATORIAL MATERIALS DEVELOPMENT | [2001/42] | French: | TECHNIQUE DE DEVELOPPEMENT DE MATERIAUX COMBINATOIRES | [2001/42] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2001/42: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar. | EPB 2001/42: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available. | EPB 2001/42: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles. | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 01.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 08.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9501606 (DAYLIGHT CHEMICAL INFORMATION SYSTEMS INC.) [X] 1,18 * the whole document * | [X] - T W BRUICE AND W F LIMA, "Control of complexity constraints on combinatorial screening for preferred oligonucleotide hybridization sites on structured DNA", BIOCHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA., US, (1997), vol. 36, no. 16, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 5004 - 5019, XP002145474 [X] 1,3,9-11,16,18,24-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi9620767 |