|
09.11.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
9 |
|
28.09.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.09.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
05.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2012 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.06.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.01.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Brief notification setting aside the communication about the intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Disapproval about the text proposed for grant of the European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Disapproval about the text proposed for grant of the European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
11.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
11.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.10.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2007 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.08.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
15.08.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2007 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2007 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.04.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.04.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
19.06.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2005 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2005 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
19.03.2004 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.03.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
21.09.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.09.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
39 |