EP1181427 - WINDOW OR DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEGENIA-AUBI KG Industriestrasse 1-3 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states SIEGENIA-AUBI KG Industriestrasse 1-3 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | ||
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states SIEGENIA-AUBI KG Eisenhüttenstrasse 22 57074 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states SIEGENIA-AUBI KG Industriestrasse 1-3 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | ||
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states SIEGENIA-FRANK KG Eisenhüttenstrasse 22 57074 Siegen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERSDORF, Oliver Knappenweg 2 D-57578 Birken Honigsessen / DE | 02 /
LOHMANN, Cord Dielfe Strasse 1 D-57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | 03 /
ROTGER STEIGEMANN, Carmen Brunnenweg 1 D-57078 Siegen / DE | 04 /
SASSMANNSHAUSEN, Jürgen Auf der Burg 17 D-57271 Hilchenbach / DE | [2004/21] |
Former [2002/09] | 01 /
GERSDORF, Oliver Knappenweg 2 D-57578 Birken Hongsessen / DE | ||
02 /
LOHMANN, Cord Dielfe Strasse 1 D-57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | |||
03 /
ROTGER STEIGEMANN, Carmen Brunnenweg 1 D-57078 Siegen / DE | |||
04 /
SASSMANNSHAUSEN, Jürgen Auf der Burg 17 D-57271 Hilchenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 00909229.7 | 22.02.2000 | [2002/09] | WO2000EP01433 | Priority number, date | DE1999209214U | 31.05.1999 Original published format: DE 29909214 U | [2002/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0073608 | Date: | 07.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1181427 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1181427 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05C17/02, E06B7/23 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
E05B47/026 (EP);
E05B47/0012 (EP);
E05B51/02 (EP);
E06B7/02 (EP);
E06B7/2318 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 11.09.2001 | Title | German: | FENSTER ODER TÜR | [2002/09] | English: | WINDOW OR DOOR | [2002/09] | French: | FENETRE OU PORTE | [2002/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 16.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.10.2004 | IE | 20.10.2004 | NL | 20.10.2004 | DK | 20.01.2005 | GR | 20.01.2005 | SE | 20.01.2005 | ES | 31.01.2005 | CY | 22.02.2005 | LU | 22.02.2005 | BE | 28.02.2005 | CH | 28.02.2005 | LI | 28.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | PT | 20.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
CY | 22.02.2005 | ||
LU | 22.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
LU | 22.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 20.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1861427U (GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9,10,12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1936929 (FRACH WERNER) [A] 1,5,8,11* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US3563586 (CREAMER JOHN M, et al) [A] 1,11 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [AD]DE1759697 (WERNER FRACH FA) [AD] 1,5,8 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE1709345 (WERNER FRACH FA) [AD] 1,5,8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3628271 (HOERNSCHEMEYER ALWIN [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,6,7,12 * figures 2A-2C; claims 1-3 * |