EP1159776 - OPTOELECTRONIC SYSTEM COMPRISING SEVERAL EVANESCENT FIELD COUPLED SECTIONS WITH RESPECTIVE FUNCTIONS AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEGAY, Philippe 1 Park Ar Castel F-22700 Louannec / FR | 02 /
RAMDANE, Abderrahim 11 D, allée d'Honneur F-92330 Sceaux / FR | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00909439.2 | 07.03.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000FR00558 | Priority number, date | FR19990002822 | 08.03.1999 Original published format: FR 9902822 | [2001/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0054379 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159776 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159776 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/026 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
H01S5/1032 (EP,US);
H01S5/02 (EP,US);
H01S5/026 (EP,US);
H01S5/0265 (EP,US);
H01S5/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/49] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES SYSTEM MIT MEHREREN FUNKTIONELLEN SEKTOREN VERBUNDEN DURCH DÄMPFUNGSKOPPLUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2002/28] | English: | OPTOELECTRONIC SYSTEM COMPRISING SEVERAL EVANESCENT FIELD COUPLED SECTIONS WITH RESPECTIVE FUNCTIONS AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | [2001/49] | French: | SYSTEME OPTOELECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT PLUSIEURS SECTIONS A FONCTIONS RESPECTIVES COUPLEES PAR COUPLAGE EVANESCENT ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION | [2001/49] |
Former [2001/49] | OPTISCHES SYSTEM MIT MEHRERE FUNKTIONELLEN SEKTOREN VERBUNDEN DURCH DÄMPFUNGSKOPPLUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 19.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2003 | CY | 28.05.2003 | FI | 28.05.2003 | IE | 28.05.2003 | DK | 28.08.2003 | GR | 28.08.2003 | PT | 28.08.2003 | SE | 28.08.2003 | ES | 08.09.2003 | [2007/08] |
Former [2004/23] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 28.08.2003 | |
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 28.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4054363 (SUEMATSU YASUHARU) [X] 1-6,15-17 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 20; figures 4,6,10-16 * * column 4, lines 47-56 * [A] 7,9; | [A]EP0741316 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8 * figures 8,9 *; | [A]EP0828325 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,11-19 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 44; figure 2 *; | [A] - LEE S -L ET AL, "INTEGRATION OF SEMICONDUCTOR LASER AMPLIFIERS WITH SAMPLED GRATING TUNABLE LASERS FOR WDM APPLICATIONS", IEEE JOURNAL OF SELECTED TOPICS IN QUANTUM ELECTRONICS,US,IEEE SERVICE CENTER, vol. 3, no. 2, ISSN 1077-260X, page 615-627, XP000735962 [A] 1-19 * page 617, column L; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2944.605713 | [A] - CHUANG Z M ET AL, "PHOTONIC INTEGRATED TUNABLE RECEIVERS WITH OPTICAL PREAMPLIFIERS FOR DIRECT DETECTION", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, vol. 63, no. 7, ISSN 0003-6951, page 880-882, XP000388128 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.109888 | [DA] - KOCH T L ET AL, "HIGH PERFORMANCE TUNABLE 1.5 M INGAAS/INGAASP MULTIPLE QUANTUM WELL DISTRIBUTED BRAGG REFLECTOR LASERS", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, vol. 53, no. 12, ISSN 0003-6951, page 1036-1038, XP000020134 [DA] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.100057 |