EP1199608 - TONER FOR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHY AND METHOD OF FORMING IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI XEROX CO., LTD. 17-22, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 107-0052 / JP | [2013/37] |
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states FUJI XEROX CO., LTD. 17-22, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo, 107-0052 / JP | ||
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Yasushige Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Toru Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
WATANUKI, Tsuneo Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
SAWATARI, Norio Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
ISHIMARU, Seijiro Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 06 /
FURUSE, Yasuyuki Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2013/37] |
Former [2002/17] | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Yasushige Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAHASHI, Toru Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
WATANUKI, Tsuneo Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
04 /
SAWATARI, Norio Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
05 /
ISHIMARU, Seijiro Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
06 /
FURUSE, Yasuyuki Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Benedum, Ulrich Max Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstrasse 3 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Benedum, Ulrich Max Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstrasse 3 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Benedum, Ulrich Max Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstrasse 3 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Benedum, Ulrich Max Haseltine Lake Partners Theatinerstrasse 3 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/04] | Benedum, Ulrich Max Haseltine Lake Partners Rosenheimer Strasse 30 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/17] | Gibbs, Christopher Stephen Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00909738.7 | 17.03.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000JP01678 | Priority number, date | WO1999JP03822 | 15.07.1999 Original published format: PCT/JP99/03822 | [2002/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0106322 | Date: | 25.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1199608 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1199608 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03G13/20, G03G9/097, G03G9/087 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
G03G9/08704 (EP,US);
G03G13/20 (EP,US);
G03G9/08742 (EP,US);
G03G9/08755 (EP,US);
G03G9/08782 (EP,US);
G03G9/09733 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/17] | G03G9/087, G03G15/20, G03G15/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | TONER FÜR DIE ELEKTROPHOTOGRAPHIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2002/17] | English: | TONER FOR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHY AND METHOD OF FORMING IMAGE | [2002/17] | French: | TONER POUR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIE ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'IMAGES | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2001 | Translation filed | 07.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 11.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2005 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 17.03.2014 | FR | 31.03.2014 | [2015/09] |
Former [2015/08] | FR | 31.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6366563 ; | [Y]JPH0815892 ; | [Y]US5618648 (HORIKOSHI YUZO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3 * column 6, line 39 - line 46 * * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 6 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 36 *; | [A]EP0707239 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] * page 12, line 7 - line 9 * * claims 1,7 * * page 9, line 37 - page 10, line 19 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880809), vol. 0122, no. 90, Database accession no. (P - 742), & JP63066563 A 19880325 (TOYO INK MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-22 * page 2 * * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 18, Database accession no. 1988-122822, XP002296870 & JPS6366563 A 19880325 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [X] 1-22 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08015892 A 19960119 (TORAY IND INC) [Y] 1,3 * claims 1-3 * * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 13, Database accession no. 1996-120258, XP002296871 & JPH0815892 A 19960119 (TORAY IND INC) [Y] 1,3 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS63193155 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPH0572812 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH05297626 (MINOLTA CAMERA KK); | [A]JPH06130851 (HITACHI KOKI KK); | [A]US5595850 (HONJO TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [A]US5691096 (BAIRD BRIAN WILLIAM [US], et al); | [A]JPH10301332 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]WO9923534 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) | Examination | GB2100873 |