EP1181661 - MANAGING PRODUCTION AND OPERATIONS USING READ/WRITE RFID TAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics Corporation 951 Yamato Road Boca Raton, Florida 33431-0700 / US | [2002/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESNARD, Philippe 60, Bois-le-Roi F-45210 Griselles / FR | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Hafner, Dieter Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Hafner, Dieter, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00910010.8 | 28.01.2000 | [2002/09] | WO2000US02205 | Priority number, date | US19990240397 | 29.01.1999 Original published format: US 240397 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0045324 | Date: | 03.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1181661 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K1/00, G06F17/60 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP);
G06K17/00 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/09] | G06K1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2002/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG VON PRODUCTION UND TÄTIGKEITEN MIT BESCHREIBBAREN RFID-FUNKETIKETTEN | [2002/09] | English: | MANAGING PRODUCTION AND OPERATIONS USING READ/WRITE RFID TAGS | [2002/09] | French: | GESTION DE PRODUCTION ET D'OPERATIONS A L'AIDE D'ETIQUETTES D'IDENTIFICATION RADIOFREQUENCE (RFID) DE LECTURE/ECRITURE | [2002/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.07.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 06.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/34] | 28.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5478990 (MONTANARI DANNY J [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * column 3, line 11 - line 16 * * column 3, line 41 - line 53 * * column 4, line 11 - line 19 * * column 4, line 34 - line 38 * * column 6, line 23 - line 26 *; | [Y]US5583819 (ROESNER BRUCE B [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5785181 (QUARTARARO JR PETER J [US]); | [Y]US5856931 (MCCASLAND MARTIN [US]); | [YP]US5910776 (BLACK DONALD [US]); | [YP]US5963134 (BOWERS JOHN H [US], et al); | [YP]US5971592 (KRALJ NICHOLAS L [US], et al); | [YP]US6002344 (BANDY WILLIAM R [US], et al); | [AE]US6025780 (BOWERS JOHN H [US], et al); | [AE]US6032127 (SCHKOLNICK MARIO [US], et al) |