EP1154968 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ARTIFICIAL STONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrieres Feidt S.A.R.L. 36, avenue des Archiducs 1135 Luxembourg / LU | [2001/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHARFE, Guy 44, rue de Bertrange L-8216 Mamer / LU | 02 /
FEIDT, Guy 8, rue De L'Europe L-7225 Bereldange / LU | 03 /
VULCANO, Nelly 271, route des Longènes F-88290 Saulxures-sur-Moselotte / FR | 04 /
LECOMTE, André 49, rue du Chanoine Boulanger F-54220 Malzeville / FR | 05 /
PIROTTE, Michel 65, rue du Beynert B-6717 Metzert / BE | 06 /
STEICHEN, Claude 9a, rue Principale L-8612 Pratz / LU | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 00910674.1 | 12.02.2000 | [2001/47] | WO2000EP01169 | Priority number, date | LU19990090354 | 24.02.1999 Original published format: LU 90354 | [2001/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0050356 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1154968 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1154968 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/02, C04B28/00, B28B23/00 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
B28B23/0081 (EP);
C04B28/02 (EP);
C04B40/006 (EP);
C04B2111/547 (EP);
C04B2111/72 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B14/06, C04B40/0028, C04B40/006, C04B2103/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, LU, NL [2002/48] |
Former [2001/47] | BE, DE, FR, LU, NL | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON KUNSTSTEINEN | [2001/47] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ARTIFICIAL STONE | [2001/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PIERRES RECONSTITUEES | [2001/47] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 04.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4017321 (REIGHTER DAVID H) [A] 1-4,13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE261454 (INDUSTRIEWERKE G.M.B.H.) [A] 1,5,11,12,15,16 * the whole document * |