EP1154906 - REINFORCING PLY FOR TYRE, METHOD FOR MAKING SAME AND METHOD FOR MAKING A TYRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | ||
For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. 10-12, route Louis-Braille 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | |||
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states Sociéte de Technologie Michelin 23 rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN RECHERCHE ET TECHNIQUE S.A. 10-12, route Louis-Braille CH-1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILLIERES, Jean 7, rue du Parc de Montjuzet F-63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Diernaz, Christian, et al Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Diernaz, Christian, et al Michelin & Cie Service SGD/LG/PI-LAD 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00910676.6 | 14.02.2000 | [2001/47] | WO2000EP01189 | Priority number, date | FR19990002145 | 19.02.1999 Original published format: FR 9902145 | [2001/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0048850 | Date: | 24.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1154906 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1154906 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/18, B60C9/00, B29D30/38 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
B60C9/08 (EP,US);
B29D30/08 (KR);
B29C43/28 (EP,US);
B29C48/156 (EP,US);
B29C70/523 (EP,US);
B29D30/38 (EP,US);
B60C9/04 (EP,US);
B60C9/20 (EP,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,US);
B29D2030/381 (EP,US);
B29L2030/004 (EP,US);
B29L2030/005 (EP,US);
Y10T152/1081 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10819 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10837 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10846 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/21] |
Former [2001/47] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKUNGSSCHICHT FÜR REIFEN,VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN, UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES REIFENS | [2001/47] | English: | REINFORCING PLY FOR TYRE, METHOD FOR MAKING SAME AND METHOD FOR MAKING A TYRE | [2001/47] | French: | NAPPE DE RENFORCEMENT POUR PNEUMATIQUE, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DU PNEUMATIQUE | [2001/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 28.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 01.09.2008 | GB | 14.02.2009 | [2010/23] |
Former [2008/47] | ES | 01.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07186614 ; | [AD]FR1331934 (MICHELIN & CIE) [AD] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1419480 (PIRELLI) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US3392774 (LEBOSSE ROBERT F) [A] 1,7 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]FR2075851 (MICHELIN & CIE) [AD] 1,3 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 12 *; | [AD]FR2351810 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1,7,22,27 * claim - *; | [A]EP0454932 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 29* figures 3-5; claim - *; | [A]EP0619170 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1,22,29 * figures 5,6; claim 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07186614 A 19950725 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |