EP1253878 - ANCHORING ACETABULAR CUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ortho - I.D. Sarl 30, rue du 35iéme Régiment d'Aviation 69500 Bron / FR | For all designated states Bonnard, Olivier 21, rue Duquesne 69330 Meyzieu / FR | For all designated states Bauchu, Philippe 4, rue Clotilde Bizolon 69002 Lyon / FR | For all designated states Cypres, Alain 36, Place des Promenades 42300 Roanne / FR | For all designated states Fiquet, Arnaud 4, rue Montée des Lilas 69300 Caluire / FR | For all designated states Girardin, Philippe Puy Money 42600 Lezigneux / FR | For all designated states Noyer, Daniel Hameau le Fourgeon 38200 Luzinay / FR | [2005/10] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Ortho - I.D. Sarl 13, rue de la Viabert 69006 Lyon / FR | ||
For all designated states Bonnard, Olivier 21, rue Duquesne 69330 Meyzieu / FR | |||
For all designated states Bauchu, Philippe 4, rue Clotilde Bizolon 69002 Lyon / FR | |||
For all designated states Cypres, Alain 36, Place des Promenades 42300 Roanne / FR | |||
For all designated states Fiquet, Arnaud 4, rue Montée des Lilas 69300 Caluire / FR | |||
For all designated states Girardin, Philippe Puy Money 42600 Lezigneux / FR | |||
For all designated states Noyer, Daniel Hameau le Fourgeon 38200 Luzinay / FR | |||
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Ortho - I.D. Sarl 13, rue de la Viabert 69006 Lyon / FR | ||
For all designated states Bonnard, Olivier 21, rue Duquesne 69330 Meyzieu / FR | |||
For all designated states Bauchu, Philippe 4, rue Clotilde Bizolon 69002 Lyon / FR | |||
For all designated states Cypres, Alain 36, Place des Promenades 42300 Roanne / FR | |||
For all designated states Fiquet, Arnaud 4, rue Mont e des Lilas 69300 Caluire / FR | |||
For all designated states Girardin, Philippe Puy Money 42600 Lezigneux / FR | |||
For all designated states Noyer, Daniel Hameau le Fourgeon 38200 Luzinay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONNARD, Olivier 21, rue Duquesne F-69330 Meyzieu / FR | 02 /
BAUCHU, Philippe 4, rue Clotilde Bizolon F-69002 Lyon / FR | 03 /
CYPRES, Alain 36, Place des Promenades F-42300 Roanne / FR | 04 /
FIQUET, Arnaud 4, rue Montée des Lilas F-69300 Caluire / FR | 05 /
GIRARDIN, Philippe Puy Money F-42600 Lezigneux / FR | 06 /
NOYER, Daniel Hameau le Fourgeon F-38200 Luzinay / FR | 07 /
MOULIN, Jean 13, rue de la Viabert F-69006 Lyon / FR | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Brédeville, Odile Marie, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Brédeville, Odile Marie, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau,BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2002/45] | Arbousse-Bastide, Jean-Claude Philippe Cabinet Arbousse Bastide, 6, rue de Rungis 67200 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 00911003.2 | 20.03.2000 | [2002/45] | WO2000FR00688 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0170141 | Date: | 27.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1253878 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1253878 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/34 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
A61F2/34 (EP);
A61B17/0642 (EP);
A61B17/68 (EP);
A61B17/86 (EP);
A61B2017/0647 (EP);
A61B2017/0648 (EP);
A61F2/30744 (EP);
A61F2/30767 (EP);
A61F2/32 (EP);
A61F2002/30322 (EP);
A61F2002/30354 (EP);
A61F2002/30378 (EP);
A61F2002/30578 (EP);
A61F2002/30787 (EP);
A61F2002/3083 (EP);
A61F2002/30894 (EP);
A61F2002/30906 (EP);
A61F2002/3208 (EP);
A61F2002/3401 (EP);
A61F2002/3412 (EP);
A61F2002/3417 (EP);
A61F2002/342 (EP);
A61F2002/3443 (EP);
A61F2002/3482 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÜFTGELENKVERANKERUNGSPFANNE | [2002/45] | English: | ANCHORING ACETABULAR CUP | [2002/45] | French: | CALOTTE D'ANCRAGE ACETABULAIRE | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 21.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.05.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 08.05.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.05.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.12.2004 | FI | 08.12.2004 | DK | 08.03.2005 | GR | 08.03.2005 | SE | 08.03.2005 | CY | 20.03.2005 | LU | 20.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | PT | 08.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
SE | 08.03.2005 | ||
CY | 20.03.2005 | ||
LU | 20.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
SE | 08.03.2005 | ||
CY | 20.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
SE | 08.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 08.12.2004 | |
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 08.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH663893 (SULZER AG, et al); | [A]EP0407332 (SULZER AG [CH], et al); | [DA]EP0532439 (IMPACT [FR], et al) [DA] 1-4,8 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0771552 (NEGRE JACQUES ETIENNE LEOPOLD [FR], et al) [AD] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5658338 (TULLOS HUGH S [US], et al) [AD] 1,2,4 * figures 2,4,5,7,11; claims 3,12 * * column 14, line 9 - line 54 *; | [A]FR2770769 (ORTHOTECHNIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1,3,4,6,7; claims 1,2,11 * * page 6, line 22 - line 24 *; | [A]EP0963740 (MERCK BIOMATERIAL FRANCE [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6,8 * figures 1,12-14; claims 1,3,4 * * column 5, line 23 - line 25 *; | [E]FR2783703 (BAUCHU PHILIPPE [FR]) [E] 1-8* the whole document * | by applicant | FR2197561 | EP0532439 | EP0555004 | EP0771552 | US5658338 |