EP1173255 - USE OF PIRENOXINE FOR THE PROTECTION OF CORNEAL TISSUES IN PHOTOKERATECTOMY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FARMIGEA S.P.A. Via G.B. Oliva, 6/8 56121 Pisa / IT | [2004/22] |
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states FARMIGEA S.P.A. Via Carmignani, 2 I-56127 Pisa / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boldrini, Enrico Farmigea S.p.A., Via Carmignani 2 56127 Pisa / IT | 02 /
Ciuffi, Mario, Univ. 'Degli Studi di Firenze e Clinica Mario Aiazzi Mancini Viale Pieraccini 6, 50134 Firenze / IT | [2002/18] |
Former [2002/04] | 01 /
Boldrini, Enrico Farmigea S.p.A., Via Carmignani 2 56127 Pisa / IT | ||
02 /
Ciuffi, Mario, Univ. 'Degli Studi di Firenze e Clinica Mario Aiazzi Mancini Viale Pierraccini 6, 50134 Firenze / IT | Representative(s) | Banchetti, Marina, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Banchetti, Marina, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 00911259.0 | 13.03.2000 | [2002/04] | WO2000IT00081 | Priority number, date | IT1999RM00166 | 17.03.1999 Original published format: IT RM990166 | [2002/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0054757 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1173255 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1173255 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61P27/02, A61K31/535 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P41/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON PIRENOXIN ZUM SCHUTZ DES KORNEALGEWEBES WÄHREND PHOTOKERATEKTOMIE | [2002/18] | English: | USE OF PIRENOXINE FOR THE PROTECTION OF CORNEAL TISSUES IN PHOTOKERATECTOMY | [2002/04] | French: | UTILISATION DE LA PIRENOXINE POUR PROTEGER LES TISSUS CORNEENS LORS D'INTERVENTIONS DE PHOTOKERATECTOMIE | [2002/04] |
Former [2002/04] | VERWENDUNG VON PIRENOXIN ZUR SCHÜTZUNG DES KORNEALGEWEBES WÄHREND PHOTOKERATEKTOMIE | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.07.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 25.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 27.12.2006 | FI | 27.12.2006 | CY | 13.03.2007 | SE | 27.03.2007 | GR | 28.03.2007 | [2009/18] |
Former [2008/19] | DK | 27.12.2006 | |
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | DK | 27.12.2006 | |
FI | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 27.12.2006 | |
SE | 27.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0885612 (PHARMACONSULT S A S [IT]) [DA] 2,3,5-9 * the whole document *; | [A] - CIUFFI ET AL, "Protective effect of pirenoxine and U74389F on induced lipidperoxidation in mammalian lenses. An in vitro, ex vivo and in vivo study.", EXPERIMENTAL EYE RESEARCH, (199903), vol. 68, no. 3, pages 347 - 359, XP000965617 [A] 3,7,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/exer.1998.0612 |