EP1266623 - DIAGNOSIS DEVICE AND TREATMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sakamoto, Noriyasu 38-15, Doshida 2-chome, Nerima-ku Tokyo 179-0076 / JP | [2002/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. WUESTHOFF & WUESTHOFF Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00911318.4 | 23.03.2000 | [2002/51] | WO2000JP01788 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0170113 | Date: | 27.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1266623 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1266623 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
A61B5/411 (EP,KR);
A61B5/0002 (EP,KR);
A61B5/022 (EP,KR);
A61B5/024 (EP);
A61B5/02416 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2002/51] | A61B10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/51] | Title | German: | DIAGNOSTISCHES GERÄT UND THERAPEUTISCHES GERÄT | [2002/51] | English: | DIAGNOSIS DEVICE AND TREATMENT DEVICE | [2002/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2002 | Translation filed | 11.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.04.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 10.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2005 | BE | 23.02.2005 | CH | 23.02.2005 | FI | 23.02.2005 | FR | 23.02.2005 | IT | 23.02.2005 | LI | 23.02.2005 | NL | 23.02.2005 | CY | 23.03.2005 | IE | 23.03.2005 | LU | 23.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | DK | 23.05.2005 | GB | 23.05.2005 | GR | 23.05.2005 | SE | 23.05.2005 | ES | 03.06.2005 | PT | 03.08.2005 | DE | 01.10.2005 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
FR | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
CY | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
LU | 23.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GB | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
DE | 01.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
FR | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
CY | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 23.04.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GB | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
DE | 01.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
FR | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 23.04.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GB | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
DE | 01.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
FR | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GB | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
DE | 01.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
FR | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
DE | 01.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
DE | 01.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/18] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
DE | 01.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
CH | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
LI | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 23.02.2005 | |
BE | 23.02.2005 | ||
FI | 23.02.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 23.02.2005 | |
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 23.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [X]JPS59183728 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN); | [Y]JPH04180730 (TAKARA ATSUFUKU); | [X]JPH07313494 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JPH09505760 ; | [X] - "Houshasen chiryou to CT", SHUUJUNSHA, (19821220), pages 22 - 35, XP002946970 | Examination | US4320767 | US4425920 | US4576181 | US5520190 | EP0922431 |