EP1161745 - GRAPHICS SYSTEM HAVING A SUPER-SAMPLED SAMPLE BUFFER WITH GENERATION OF OUTPUT PIXELS USING SELECTIVE ADJUSTMENT OF FILTERING FOR REDUCED ARTIFACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEERING, Michael, F. 657 Cuesta Drive Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Harris, Ian Richard D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00911860.5 | 17.02.2000 | [2001/50] | WO2000US04149 | Priority number, date | US19990251453 | 17.02.1999 Original published format: US 251453 | US19990413104 | 06.10.1999 Original published format: US 413104 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0049578 | Date: | 24.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161745 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1161745 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/50 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
G06T5/20 (EP,US);
G06T11/001 (EP,US);
G06T11/40 (EP,US);
G06T15/005 (EP,US);
G06T15/503 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2002/44] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | GRAPHISCHES SYSTEM MIT SUPER-ABGETASTETEM MUSTERPUFFER MIT ERZEUGUNG VON AUSGANGPIXELN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SELEKTIVEN ADJUSTIERUNG DER FILTERUNG ZUR ARTIFAKTVERMINDERUNG | [2001/50] | English: | GRAPHICS SYSTEM HAVING A SUPER-SAMPLED SAMPLE BUFFER WITH GENERATION OF OUTPUT PIXELS USING SELECTIVE ADJUSTMENT OF FILTERING FOR REDUCED ARTIFACTS | [2001/50] | French: | SYSTEME GRAPHIQUE COMPRENANT UN TAMPON D'ECHANTILLONNAGE SUPER-ECHANTILLONNE GENERANT DES PIXELS DE SORTIE AU MOYEN DE L'AJUSTEMENT SELECTIF DU FILTRAGE POUR PRODUIRE MOINS D'ARTEFACTS | [2001/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 30.10.2002 | IE | 17.02.2003 | [2004/15] |
Former [2003/45] | NL | 30.10.2002 | |
DE | 31.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 30.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0313101 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 28* page 16, line 42 - line 50 *; | [X]EP0463700 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,7-13,20,21,25-27,29-31 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 5 * * column 5, line 18 - column 8, line 55 *; | [X]GB2278524 (NIHON UNISYS LTD [JP]) [X] 2-6,22-24 * the whole document * |