EP1155498 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A DATA FLOW AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR READING A DATA FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPERSCHNEIDER, Ralph Donato-Polli-Strasse 42 D-91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
DIETZ, Martin Kleinreuther Weg 47 D-90408 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
HOMM, Daniel Wichernstrasse 18 D-91052 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
BÖHM, Reinhold Etzlaubweg 12 D-90469 Nürnberg / DE | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2001/47] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00912430.6 | 17.01.2000 | [2001/47] | WO2000EP00314 | Priority number, date | DE19991007728 | 23.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19907728 | [2001/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0051242 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1155498 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1155498 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/40 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
H03M7/40 (EP,US);
G10L19/005 (KR);
G10L19/02 (KR);
G10L21/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/11] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN EINES DATENSTROMS UND VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM LESEN EINES DATENSTROMS | [2001/47] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A DATA FLOW AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR READING A DATA FLOW | [2001/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN FLUX DE DONNEES, ET DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LIRE UN FLUX DE DONNEES | [2001/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 06.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 10.06.2004 | GR | 10.06.2004 | ES | 21.06.2004 | PT | 10.08.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2005/18] | DK | 10.06.2004 | |
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | GR | 10.06.2004 | |
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | GR | 10.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0612156 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [DA] 1,12,18,19 * abstract *; | [PA]DE19747119 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [PA] 1,12,18,19* abstract * |