EP1153165 - A DOSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERRATT, Paul Robertson Elida Faberge Ltd, Coal Road, Seacroft Leeds, Yorkshire LS14 2AR / GB | 02 /
SHICKLE, Mark 14 Carew Road, Ealing London W13 9QL / GB | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00912441.3 | 02.02.2000 | [2001/46] | WO2000EP00801 | Priority number, date | GB19990003752 | 18.02.1999 Original published format: GB 9903752 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0049218 | Date: | 24.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153165 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/02 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
D06F39/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/46] | Title | German: | DOSIERVORRICHTUNG | [2001/46] | English: | A DOSING DEVICE | [2001/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/11] | 05.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2792701 (JOHN BOCHAN) [X] 1-7,11-17 * column W * [A] 8-10; | [A]US4186573 (BRENNER ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1,7,8,14-17* column W * |