EP1183244 - METHOD OF PRODUCING CYANURIC CHLORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖRNER, Walter Lessingstrasse 12 D-63579 Freigericht / DE | 02 /
MARQUARDT, Ralph Schwarzburgstrasse 22 D-60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
SCHAUHOFF, Stephanie Bergerstrasse 152 D-60385 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 04 /
SCHICK, Christine Bettinastrasse 66 D-63067 Offenbach / DE | 05 /
VANHEERTUM, Rudolf Antoinettalei 1 B-2930 Brasschaat / BE | [2002/10] | Application number, filing date | 00912567.5 | 08.03.2000 | [2002/10] | WO2000EP02013 | Priority number, date | DE1999118245 | 22.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19918245 | [2002/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0064879 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1183244 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1183244 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/28 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
C07D251/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, LI [2004/18] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CYANURCHLORID | [2002/10] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING CYANURIC CHLORIDE | [2002/10] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DU CHLORURE CYANURIQUE | [2002/10] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 06.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US3312697 (J.RIETHMANN) [DY] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [DA]US3707544 (SURYANARAYANA YELAGONDAHALLY S, et al) [DA] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [DY]US3867382 (SURYANARAYANA YELAGONDAHALLY S, et al) [DY] 1-5 * the whole document * |