EP1166537 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DEFINING INTERFACE AND TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2008/08] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEUDER, Uwe Yrttikatu 17 B 2 FIN-33710 Tampere / FI | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 1 B 33720 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2005/21] | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy, Hermiankatu 12 B 33720 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2002/01] | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko, et al Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 00912694.7 | 15.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000FI00207 | Priority number, date | FI19990000588 | 16.03.1999 Original published format: FI 990588 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0056084 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1166537 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1166537 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04M3/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE DEFINITION EINER SCHNITTSTELLE SOWIE TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2002/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DEFINING INTERFACE AND TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2002/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR LA DEFINITION D'UN SYSTEME D'INTERFACE ET DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 14.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 07.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | BE | 13.08.2008 | CY | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | IE | 15.03.2009 | LU | 15.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 15.03.2009 | ||
LU | 15.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 15.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 15.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 15.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 15.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0592154 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]US5377186 (WEGNER DAVID C [US], et al); | [XP]WO9940711 (AMERITECH CORP [US], et al) |