EP1163008 - USE OF TREHALOSE FOR STABILISING A LIQUID VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pasteur 2, Avenue pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR | [2001/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENTSCH GRAF, Sandrine 10, rue Janin F-69004 Lyon / FR | 02 /
CARTIER, Jean-René 55, rue Joliot Curie F-69005 Lyon / FR | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Kerneis, Daniéle, et al Sanofi Pasteur Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 2 Avenue Pont Pasteur 69367 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Kerneis, Danièle, et al Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, Aventis Pasteur, 2, Avenue pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 00912734.1 | 23.03.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000FR00730 | Priority number, date | FR19990003765 | 23.03.1999 Original published format: FR 9903765 | [2001/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0056365 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163008 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1163008 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/26, A61K39/02, A61K39/09, A61K39/095, A61K39/102, A61K39/385, A61P31/04 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61K39/102 (EP);
A61K47/26 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/6037 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON THREALOSE ZUR STABILISIERUNG VON EINEM FLÜSSIGEN IMPFSTOFF | [2001/51] | English: | USE OF TREHALOSE FOR STABILISING A LIQUID VACCINE | [2001/51] | French: | UTILISATION DE TREHALOSE POUR STABILISER UN VACCIN LIQUIDE | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 04.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Request for further processing for: | 19.08.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.09.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.08.2003 | MC | 31.03.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/02] | MC | 31.03.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4206200 (GUTHOHRLEIN GERHARD [DE], et al); | [A]WO8606635 (BIOTECH AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU]); | [A]WO9533488 (QUADRANT HOLDINGS CAMBRIDGE [GB]); | [A]WO9912568 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); |