EP1093232 - PROCESSOR AND PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMANAKA, Ryutaro 1-33-15-201, Kamiooka-higashi Konan-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 233-000 / JP | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00912897.6 | 29.03.2000 | [2001/16] | WO2000JP01931 | Priority number, date | JP19990097002 | 02.04.1999 Original published format: JP 9700299 | [2001/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0060749 | Date: | 12.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1093232 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/27 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
H03M13/2707 (EP);
H03M13/276 (EP);
H03M13/2778 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/16] | Title | German: | PROZESSOR UND VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2001/16] | English: | PROCESSOR AND PROCESSING METHOD | [2001/16] | French: | PROCESSEUR ET METHODE DE TRAITEMENT | [2001/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2000 | Translation filed | 23.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 28.01.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH05334183 (PFU LTD); | [A]JPH07168759 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH10240614 (NEC NIIGATA LTD) |