EP1116550 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR SPECTACLE LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/29] | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR SPECTACLE LENS AND LENS PROCESSING DEVICE | ||
[2006/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAZAWA, Makoto Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Melzer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00913043.6 | 31.03.2000 | [2001/29] | WO2000JP02099 | Priority number, date | JP19990095086 | 01.04.1999 Original published format: JP 9508699 | [2001/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0059679 | Date: | 12.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1116550 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1116550 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B24B9/14, G02C7/02, G02C13/00 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
B24B13/0055 (EP,US);
B24B9/14 (EP,US);
B24B9/148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BRILLENGLÄSERN | [2006/29] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR SPECTACLE LENS | [2006/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE VERRES DE LUNETTES | [2006/29] |
Former [2001/29] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BRILLENGLÄSERN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2001/29] | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR SPECTACLE LENS AND LENS PROCESSING DEVICE | ||
Former [2001/29] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE VERRES DE LUNETTES ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE VERRES | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2000 | Translation filed | 28.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 22.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.06.2006 | 22.05.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5053971 (WOOD KENNETH O [US], et al); | [X]JP2507643Y ; | [Y]JPH06191159 (HOYA CORP) | Examination | JPH0999444 | WO9906225 |