EP1201697 - BIODEGRADABLE HIGH-MOLECULAR POLYESTER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology Ministry of Economy and Industry, 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology Ministry of Economy and Industry, 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology Ministry of Economy and Industry, 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAGUCHI, Yoichi Nat. Inst. Material & Chem. Res. 1-1, Higashi Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0046 / JP | 02 /
OISHI, Akihiro Nat. Inst. Material & Chem. Res. 1-1, Higashi Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0046 / JP | 03 /
IKEDA, Yoshikazu Nat. Inst. Material & Chem. Res. 1-1, Higashi Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0046 / JP | 04 /
FUJITA, Ken-ichi Nat. Inst. Material & Chem. Res. 1-1, Higashi Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0046 / JP | 05 /
MASUDA, Takashi Nat. Inst. Material & Chem. Res. 1-1, Higashi Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0046 / JP | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2002/18] | Waldren, Robin Michael Lloyd Wise, Treager & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00913057.6 | 31.03.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000JP02118 | Priority number, date | JP19990241591 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: JP 24159199 | [2002/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0116206 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1201697 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1201697 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/16, C08G63/672 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
C08G63/16 (EP,US);
C08G63/672 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/18] | C08G63/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BIOABBAUBARE HOCHMOLEKULARE POLYESTER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2002/18] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE HIGH-MOLECULAR POLYESTER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2002/18] | French: | POLYESTER BIODEGRADABLE A MASSE MOLECULAIRE ELEVEE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2001 | Translation filed | 17.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: EURO-PCT translation(s) not filed | 17.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 18.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.09.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   17.09.2001 | 14.09.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   17.09.2001 | 14.09.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   17.09.2001 | 14.09.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   17.09.2001 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.09.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   17.09.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 09.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH0931176 ; | [A]US3997512 (CASEY DONALD J, et al) [A] 1-4 * whole document *; | [A]EP0650994 (CHEIL SYNTHETICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-4* abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09031176 A 19970204 (SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER CO LTD;SHOWA DENKO KK) [AD] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH0931176 (SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER, et al); | [A]JPH0940762 (MATSUMOTO YUSHI SEIYAKU KK) |