EP1200888 - HYPERLINK LINK BROWSER WITH MULTILINK SELECT CAPABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP Portals Israel, Limited No. 4 Hacharoshet Street 43657 Ra'anana / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states SAP Portals Israel, Limited No. 4 Hacharoshet Street Ra'anana / IL | ||
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states Sap Portals Isreal, Ltd. No. 4 Hacharoshet Street Ra'anana / IL | ||
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states Toptier, Israel, Ltd. No. 4 Hacharoshet Street Ra'anana / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GVILY, Yaniv 16995 Del Monte Avenue 221 Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00913534.4 | 17.02.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000US04241 | Priority number, date | US19990120974P | 19.02.1999 Original published format: US 120974 P | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0049491 | Date: | 24.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1200888 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, G06T3/00, G06T11/00, G06F17/30, G06F3/033 | [2002/21] | CPC: |
G06F3/0483 (EP);
G06F16/951 (EP);
G06F16/9566 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/18] | G06F3/14, G06T3/00, G06T11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYPERLIBKBROWSER MIT MEHRFACHLINK-SELEKTIONSMÖGLICHKEIT | [2002/18] | English: | HYPERLINK LINK BROWSER WITH MULTILINK SELECT CAPABILITY | [2002/18] | French: | NAVIGATEUR HYPERLIEN CAPABLE DE SELECTIONNER UN MULTILIEN | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 27.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/07] | 30.09.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.12.2016 | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/07] | 09.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5649186 (FERGUSON GREGORY J [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *;; figures 2C,5 * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 21 * * column 3, line 25 - line 38 * * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 24 * * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 28 *; | [A]EP0834822 (CANON INFORMATION SYST INC [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 27 *; | [DY]US5848424 (SCHEINKMAN LUIZ [US], et al) [DY] 1-22 * abstract *; column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 35 * * column 3, line 19 - column 8, line 15 * * claims 1,6,9 *; | [PX]EP0957438 (IBM [US]) [PX] 1-22* whole document *; | [Y] - WILLS G J, "Selection: 524,288 ways to say this is interesting", INFORMATION VISUALIZATION '96, PROCEEDINGS IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 28-29 OCT. 1996, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19961028), ISBN 0-8186-7668-X, pages 54 - 60,120, XP010201945 [Y] 1-22 * page 54, line 1 - line L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFVIS.1996.559216 | International search | [A]US5546519 (BERRY RICHARD E [US]); | [AP]US5877766 (BATES CARY LEE [US], et al); | [AP]US5890170 (SIDANA ASHMEET S [US]); | [AP]US5911145 (ARORA SAMIR [US], et al); | [AP]US6025844 (PARSONS PAIGE K [US]) |