EP1113753 - BITE BLOCK FOR DENTAL X-RAY PROCEDURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENTSPLY International Inc. 570 West College Avenue P.O. Box 872 York, PA 17404-0872 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states Dentsply International, Inc. 570 West College Avenue, P.O. Box 872 York, PA 17404-0872 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EPPINGER, Hans 1212 Keating Drive Arlington Heights, IL 60005 / US | 02 /
VISAK, Jerry 567 Plum Grove Road Roselle, IL 60172 / US | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | Hartz, Nikolai F., Dr., et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Patentanwälte, Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00913633.4 | 25.02.2000 | [2001/28] | WO2000US05003 | Priority number, date | US19990121783P | 26.02.1999 Original published format: US 121783 P | [2001/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0049945 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1113753 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/14, G03B42/04 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
A61B6/51 (EP);
G03B42/042 (EP);
A61B6/4423 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/28] | Title | German: | BEISSBLOCK FÜR DENTALE RÖNTGENAUFNAHMEN | [2001/28] | English: | BITE BLOCK FOR DENTAL X-RAY PROCEDURES | [2001/28] | French: | PORTE-EMPREINTES DESTINE AUX PROCEDES DENTAIRES A RAYONS X | [2001/28] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 02.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/12] | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.04.2001 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | 17.04.2001 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.04.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US1571145 (SCHLAPPI ADOLPH F) [X] 1-3,5 * page 1, line 41 - line 61 * [A] 10; | [A]US1899877 (MARTIN FLORIAN J); | [X]US2688096 (GALLIANO MARIO R, et al) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 36 *; | [A]DE919907 (LUDWIG SENT); | [A]CH387873 (GOLDBERG JULIUS M [US]); | [XA]US3777141 (EGGEN S) [X] 1-6,8 * column 1, line 30 - line 50 * * column 2, line 1 - line 51 * [A] 10; | [A]WO8500007 (CUYKSE MEDISCHE CENTRALE BV [NL]) [A] 1,2,7-10 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 5 *; | [A]US5090047 (ANGOTTI MARSHALL A [US], et al) [A] 1,8-10 * column 4, line 3 - line 25 * * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 8 * | by applicant | US3473026 |