EP1228401 - STEP AND FLASH IMPRINT LITHOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 201 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 201 West 7th Street Austin Texas 78701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLSON, Carlton, Grant 4 Downie Place Austin, TX 78746 / US | 02 /
COLBURN, Matthew, Earl 808 Sweetbriar Court Waukesha, WI 53186 / US | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00913745.6 | 03.03.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000US05751 | Priority number, date | US19990266663 | 11.03.1999 Original published format: US 266663 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0054107 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1228401 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1228401 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/00 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
B29C43/003 (EP,US);
B29C43/021 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
G03F7/0002 (EP,US);
B29C2043/025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/32] | Title | German: | PRÄGEFORM-LITHOGRAPHIE | [2002/32] | English: | STEP AND FLASH IMPRINT LITHOGRAPHY | [2002/32] | French: | LITHOGRAVURE EN PHOTOREPETITION | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 11.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.08.2005 | CH | 10.08.2005 | CY | 10.08.2005 | FI | 10.08.2005 | IT | 10.08.2005 | LI | 10.08.2005 | DK | 10.11.2005 | GR | 10.11.2005 | ES | 21.11.2005 | PT | 10.01.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
IT | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
FI | 10.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH01196749 ; | [A]DE2800476 (INSTRUMENTS SA); | [A]EP0244884 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4731155 (NAPOLI LOUIS S [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 24 *; | [Y]US5126006 (CRONIN JOHN E [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * figures 18-26 *; | [Y] - HAISMA J ET AL, "MOLD-ASSISTED NANOLITHOGRAPHY: A PROCESS FOR RELIABLE PATTERN REPLICATION", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (19961101), vol. 14, no. 6, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 4124 - 4128, XP000721137 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.588604 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891109), vol. 013, no. 495, Database accession no. (P - 956), & JP01196749 A 19890808 (HOYA CORP) [Y] 1-17 * abstract * |