EP1173819 - STORAGE FACILITY FOR MAKING AVAILABLE DIFFERENT TYPES OF ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schachermayer Grosshandelsgesellschaft MBH Schachermayerstrasse 2 4020 Linz / AT | [2002/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOCH, Adolf Urbanskistrasse 6 A-4040 Linz / AT | 02 /
TOBISCH, Herbert Prandtauerstrasse 55 A-4040 Linz / AT | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 00913947.8 | 22.03.2000 | [2002/04] | WO2000AT00066 | Priority number, date | AT19990000751 | 28.04.1999 Original published format: AT 75199 | [2002/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0067166 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1173819 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1173819 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, B65G1/137 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
B65G1/1371 (EP,US);
B65G1/1373 (EP,US);
B65G2209/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/04] | Title | German: | LAGER ZUM BEREITSTELLEN VON ARTIKELN UNTERSCHIEDLICHER ART | [2002/04] | English: | STORAGE FACILITY FOR MAKING AVAILABLE DIFFERENT TYPES OF ARTICLES | [2002/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE POUR METTRE A DISPOSITION DIFFERENTS TYPES D'ARTICLES | [2002/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 15.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.01.2003 | GR | 02.01.2003 | IE | 02.01.2003 | CY | 22.03.2003 | LU | 22.03.2003 | MC | 31.03.2003 | DK | 02.04.2003 | PT | 02.04.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/44] | FI | 02.01.2003 | |
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
IE | 02.01.2003 | ||
CY | 22.03.2003 | ||
LU | 22.03.2003 | ||
DK | 02.04.2003 | ||
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 02.01.2003 | |
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
IE | 02.01.2003 | ||
LU | 22.03.2003 | ||
DK | 02.04.2003 | ||
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | FI | 02.01.2003 | |
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
IE | 02.01.2003 | ||
DK | 02.04.2003 | ||
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | FI | 02.01.2003 | |
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
IE | 02.01.2003 | ||
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 02.01.2003 | |
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 02.01.2003 | |
PT | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 02.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4974166 (MANEY GEORGE A [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 13, line 31 - column 13, line 63; figures 12-14; claims 8-11 *; | [A]EP0621216 (STARK MANUFACTURING INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, column 3, line 15 - page 3, column 4, line 27; figure - *; | [A]WO9714104 (OMNICELL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 5, line 7 - page 5, line 19; figure 1 *; | [A]US5781443 (STREET WILLIAM L [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 26 - column 3, line 64; figure -; claims 1,3,13 ** column 7, line 35 - column 7, line 45 * |