EP1162987 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR MEDICAL AND VETERINARY USE FOR REGENERATING INTESTINAL FLORA IN DIARRHOEA OR DYSPEPTIC SYNDROME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Italmed S.N.C. Di Galli G. E Pacini G. Via Andrea del Castagno, 12 50132 Firenze / IT | [2001/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLI, Giovanna Via Montalbano 3G I-50100 Firenze / IT | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Celestino, Marco ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Celestino, Marco ABM, Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | Application number, filing date | 00914133.4 | 15.03.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000EP02271 | Priority number, date | IT1999FI00051 | 15.03.1999 Original published format: IT FI990051 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0054788 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1162987 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1162987 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61P1/12, // A61K35:74, A61K33:06 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
A61K35/744 (EP);
A61K33/06 (EP);
A61K33/08 (EP);
A61K33/12 (EP);
A61K35/745 (EP);
A61K35/747 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K33/06, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/08, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/12, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K35/744, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR MEDIZINISCHE UND VETERINÄRE VERWENDUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER DARMFLORA BEI DYSPEPTISCHEM SYNDROM UND DIARRHOEEN AUF DEM VETERINÄRSEKTOR | [2002/06] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR MEDICAL AND VETERINARY USE FOR REGENERATING INTESTINAL FLORA IN DIARRHOEA OR DYSPEPTIC SYNDROME | [2001/51] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE A USAGE MEDICAL ET VETERINAIRE UTILISEE POUR REGENERER LA FLORE INTESTINALE EN CAS DE DIARRHEE OU DE SYNDROME DYSPEPTIQUE | [2001/51] |
Former [2001/51] | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR MEDIZINISCHE UND VETERINÄRE VERWENDUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER DARMFLORA IN DYSPEPTISCHER SYMPTOME UND DIARRHOEEN AUF DEM VETERINÄRSEKTOR | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 23.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.11.2002 | FI | 20.11.2002 | GR | 20.11.2002 | NL | 20.11.2002 | DK | 20.02.2003 | PT | 20.02.2003 | SE | 20.02.2003 | CY | 15.03.2003 | LU | 15.03.2003 | IE | 17.03.2003 | MC | 31.03.2003 | [2007/10] |
Former [2005/02] | BE | 20.11.2002 | |
FI | 20.11.2002 | ||
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
CY | 15.03.2003 | ||
LU | 15.03.2003 | ||
IE | 17.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | BE | 20.11.2002 | |
FI | 20.11.2002 | ||
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
CY | 15.03.2003 | ||
LU | 15.03.2003 | ||
IE | 17.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | BE | 20.11.2002 | |
FI | 20.11.2002 | ||
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
LU | 15.03.2003 | ||
IE | 17.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | BE | 20.11.2002 | |
FI | 20.11.2002 | ||
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
IE | 17.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | BE | 20.11.2002 | |
FI | 20.11.2002 | ||
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 20.11.2002 | |
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 20.11.2002 | |
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 20.11.2002 | |
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 20.02.2003 | |
SE | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 20.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0426463 (VALIO MEIJERIEN [FI]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 1 - line 22 * * claims 1-4 *; | [A]FR2674755 (THOREL JEAN NOEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 14 - line 27 ** page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 24 *; | [A]WO9300012 (PIONEER HI BRED INTERNATINAL I [US]) [A] 1-10 * example 1 * * claims 1,10 *; | [A]WO9707822 (DETUM AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 10, line 7 - line 16 * |