EP1151447 - CONTACT SPRING ELEMENT FOR AN ELECTRICAL SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies Inc. 5725 Delphi Drive Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2002/27] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | ||
For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48084 / US | |||
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | ||
For all designated states EATON CONTROLS GmbH & Co. KG An den Nahewiesen 16-18 55445 Langenlonsheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEUSCHNER, Markus Eremitager Weg 32 D-55559 Bretzenheim / DE | 02 /
ZUK, Daniela Erich-Ollenhauer-Strasse 118 D-65119 Wiesbaden / DE | 03 /
RUDOLPH, Gerd Hauptstrasse 22 D-55459 Aspisheim / DE | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Becker, Bernd, et al Patentanwälte BECKER & AUE Saarlandstrasse 66 55411 Bingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Becker, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte BECKER & AUE Saarlandstrasse 66 55411 Bingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00914332.2 | 02.02.2000 | [2001/45] | WO2000IB00458 | Priority number, date | DE19991005288 | 06.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19905288 | [2001/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0046821 | Date: | 10.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1151447 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1151447 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1151447 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/26, H01H19/62 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
H01H1/26 (EP);
H01H19/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/49] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KONTAKTFEDER-EINHEIT FÜR EINEN ELEKTRISCHEN SCHALTER | [2001/45] | English: | CONTACT SPRING ELEMENT FOR AN ELECTRICAL SWITCH | [2001/45] | French: | BLOC A LAME DE CONTACT POUR INTERRUPTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2001/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.09.2003
ADMISSIBLE E.G.O. Elektro-Gerätebau GmbH Rote-Tor-Strasse 14 75038 Oberderdingen / DE Opponent's representative Renger, Florian Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.09.2003
ADMISSIBLE E.G.O. Elektro-Gerätebau GmbH Rote-Tor-Strasse 14 75038 Oberderdingen / DE Opponent's representative Renger, Florian (DE) Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner, Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | 10.10.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.02.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.06.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.08.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.08.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.05.2008 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.12.2002 | [2007/35] | Cited in | International search | [X]US3719788 (HOLLAND K, et al) [X] 1,3,5 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 67; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB1202251 (CROUZET SA [FR]) [A] 1,3,5 * page 2, line 120 - line 127; figure 1 *; | [A]GB1251902 (SEALECTRO LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 75 - page 2, line 33; figure . *; | [A]FR2556495 (TURATTI MARIO [IT]) [A] 6 * figures 1-3 * | Opposition | DE4435303 | DE3223479 | DE9305074 | CH488269 | DE2625715 | EP0780862 | - G. Taubitz Kunststoffumspritzte Metallteile für Elektrotechnik und Elektronik; Elektroanzeiger 38. Jg., 1985, Nr. 4, Seiten 50-54 |